Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:18-bk-10518
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.
3344 N Torrey Pines Ct Ste 200
La Jolla, CA 92037-1024
Represented By
Jose F Bibiloni
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


1. Orexigen Therapeutics files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (reuters.com)
Submitted Mon 03/12/2018
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
564 564 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Tue 9:48 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re Documents Served on July 12, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 508 ,510 ,511 ,512 ,513 ,514 ,515 ,516
563 563 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Tue 5:01 PM
Application for Compensation Third Monthly Fee Application Of Perella Weinberg Partners LP For Professional Services And Disbursements As Investment Banker To The Debtor And Debtor In Possession for the period June 1, 2018 to June 30, 2018 Filed by Perella Weinberg Partners LP. Objections due by 7/31/2018. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice
562 562 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Tue 11:09 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Interim Application Of Hogan Lovells US LLP, As Bankruptcy Co-Counsel For The Debtor For Period From March 12, 2018 Through May 31, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 450 mming, Andrew
561 561 3 pgs order Order Tue 10:43 AM
Order (Omnibus) (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Reject Certain Contracts Related to the McKesson Entities and (II) Granting Certain Related Relief. Related [+] Order Signed on 7/17/2018. (GM)
Related: [-] 459 ,511
Att: 1 Exhibit A
560 560 order Reject Lease or Executory Contract Tue 10:40 AM
Order (Omnibus) (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Reject Certain Contracts (II) Granting Certain Related Relief. Related [+] Order Signed on 7/17/2018. (GM)
Related: [-] 459 459 ,511 ,519 ,555
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
559 559 court Minute Entry Tue 10:27 AM
Minute Entry Re: Related [+] Appearance: SEE ATTACHED SIGN-IN-SHEET (Sherrys)
Related: [-] 518 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B) filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.
558 558 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 9:38 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Daniel H. Slat Related [+] Order Signed on 7/17/2018. (LJH)
Related: [-] 524 524
Monday, July 16, 2018
557 557 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 10:27 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re Order Approving the Stipulation Resolving Putative Challenge of the Sabby Noteholders to the Final DIP Order and Related Matters Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 500
556 556 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 10:26 PM
Supplemental Affidavit/Declaration of Service re Documents Served on July 11, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 497 ,499
555 555 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 8:05 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 459 ,511 ,519 mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
554 554 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Mon 4:50 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Interim Fee Application Request of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, as Delaware Bankruptcy Co-Counsel for the Debtors for the period March 12, 2018 to May 31, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 452 mming, Andrew
553 553 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Mon 4:49 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Interim Application of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 12, 2018 to May 31, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 451 mming, Andrew
552 552 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Mon 4:47 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Third Monthly Statement of Ernst & Young LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2018 to May 31, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 448 mming, Andrew
551 551 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Mon 4:47 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Third Monthly Fee Application Of Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP, As Delaware Bankruptcy Co-Counsel For The Debtor For Allowance Of Interim Compensation And For Interim Reimbursement Of All Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred for the period May 1, 2018 to May 31, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 439 mming, Andrew
550 550 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Mon 4:46 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Application for Compensation of Ernst & Young LLP for the period April 1, 2018 to April 30, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 436 mming, Andrew
549 549 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 4:26 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts Related to the McKesson Entities And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Cree, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 459 ,511
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
548 548 misc Exhibit Mon 4:07 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Statement of Financial Affairs - Exhibit 4 Payments to Insiders Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 288
547 547 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Mon 3:36 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding First Application for Compensation of Elliott Greenleaf, P.C., Delaware Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 27, 2018 to April 30, 2018 Related [+] Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Sutty, Eric)
Related: [-] 413
546 546 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Mon 3:33 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding First Application for Compensation of Irell & Manella LLP, Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 27, 2018 to April 30, 2018 Related [+] Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Sutty, Eric)
Related: [-] 410
Friday, July 13, 2018
545 545 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 9:15 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re Documents Served on July 10, 2018 Related [+] Filed by. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 477 ,478 ,479 ,480 ,481 ,482 ,483 ,484 ,485 ,486 ,487 ,488 ,489 ,490 ,491 ,492 ,493 ,494 ,495 ,497 ,499
544 544 misc Exhibit Fri 8:27 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Twenty-First Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 512
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
543 543 misc Exhibit Fri 7:58 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Nineteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 494
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
542 542 misc Exhibit Fri 7:56 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Eighteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 493
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
541 541 misc Exhibit Fri 7:54 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Seventeenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 492
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
540 540 misc Exhibit Fri 7:52 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Sixteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 491
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
539 539 misc Exhibit Fri 7:20 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Fifteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 490
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
538 538 misc Exhibit Fri 7:19 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Fourteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 489
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
537 537 misc Exhibit Fri 7:17 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Thirteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 488
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
536 536 misc Exhibit Fri 7:00 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Twelfth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 487
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
535 535 misc Exhibit Fri 6:58 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Eleventh Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 486
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
534 534 misc Exhibit Fri 6:55 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Tenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 485
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
533 533 misc Exhibit Fri 6:29 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Ninth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 484
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
532 532 misc Exhibit Fri 6:28 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Eighth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 483
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
531 531 misc Exhibit Fri 6:06 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Seventh Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 482
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
530 530 misc Exhibit Fri 6:04 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Sixth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 481 ,515
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
529 529 misc Exhibit Fri 5:54 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Fifth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 480
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
528 528 misc Exhibit Fri 5:52 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Fourth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 479
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
527 527 misc Exhibit Fri 5:50 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Debtors Third Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 478
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
526 526 misc Exhibit Fri 4:45 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibit B to Debtor's Second Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Reject Certain Contracts and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 477 ,514
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
525 525 notice Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice Fri 4:21 PM
Notice of Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract Notice of Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Additional Designated Executory Contracts Related [+]. Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 231 ,438
Att: 1 Exhibit A
524 524 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 4:19 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Daniel H. Slate . Receipt Number 2419300, Filed by McKesson Corporation and its affiliates, McKesson Specialty Arizona Inc.. (Gwynne, Kurt)
Related: [-]
523 523 misc Exhibit Fri 4:17 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Supplemental Schedules To Stalking Horse APA Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 231
Att: 1 Exhibit A
522 522 order Employ (Application) Fri 3:51 PM
Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Landis Rath & Cobb LLP as Conflict Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to the Retention Date Related [+] Order Signed on 7/13/2018. (SH)
Related: [-] 423 502
521 521 order Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period Fri 3:48 PM
Order Extending the Exclusive Periods During Which the Debtor May File a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Acceptances Thereof Related [+] Order Signed on 7/13/2018. (SH)
Related: [-] 424 506
520 520 order Shorten Time Fri 2:31 PM
Order Shortening Notice of Debtor's Twenty-First Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I)Authorizing the Debtor to Reject Certain Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II)Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 7/13/2018. (SH)
Related: [-] 513 512
519 519 misc Exhibit Fri 1:40 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Further Revised Exhibit B To Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 459 ,511
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
518 518 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Fri 12:58 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/17/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-]
517 517 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Fri 11:33 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of of Sanofi Winthrop Industrie's Objection to Proposed Cure Amounts Related [+] Filed by Sanofi Withrop Industrie. (Strubeck, Jr., Louis)
Related: [-] 384
Thursday, July 12, 2018
516 516 misc Exhibit Thu 8:20 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit A To Debtor's Twentieth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 495
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
515 515 misc Exhibit Thu 8:09 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit A To Debtor's Sixth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 481
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
514 514 misc Exhibit Thu 8:03 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit A To Debtor's Second Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (Ii) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 477
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
513 513 motion Shorten - Motion Thu 7:54 PM
Motion to Shorten Notice of Debtor's Twenty-First Omnibus Objection Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/26/2018. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 512
Att: 1 Exhibit A
512 512 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Thu 7:51 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Twenty-First Omnibus Objection Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/26/2018. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
511 511 misc Exhibit Thu 7:39 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Revised Exhibit B To Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 459
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
510 510 misc Exhibit Thu 7:29 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice Of Filing Of Supplemental Schedules To Stalking Horse APA Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 231 mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
509 509 claims Claims Register Thu 5:16 PM
Claims Register Alphabetical and Numerical Order . Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Numerical
508 508 notice Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice Thu 1:11 PM
Notice of Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract Notice of Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Additional Designated Executory Contracts Related [+]. Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 231 ,438
Att: 1 Exhibit A
507 507 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 11:22 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order Approving the Stipulation Resolving Putative Challenge of the Sabby Noteholders to the Final DIP Order and Related Matters Related [+] Filed by Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C., EcoR1 Capital Fund Qualified, L.P., EcoR1 Capital Fund, L.P.. (Samis, Christopher)
Related: [-] 500
506 506 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Thu 10:42 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtor's Motion For Entry Of An Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 1121(d) Extending The Exclusive Periods During Which Only The Debtor May File A Chapter 11 Plan And Solicit Acceptances Thereof Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 424 mming, Andrew
505 505 misc Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Thu 10:40 AM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding First Monthly Statement Of Ernst & Young For Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses For The Period From March 12, 2018 Through March 31, 2018 Related [+] Filed by Ernst & Young LLP.
Related: [-] 420 mming, Andrew
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
504 504 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 7:47 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 475
503 503 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 7:44 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re Order Shortening Notice of Debtor's Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I)Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Contracts and (II)Granting Certain Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 471
502 502 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Wed 4:18 PM
Certificate of No Objection regarding the Application of the Debtor for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Landis Rath & Cobb LLP as Conflict Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Retention Date, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 327(a) and 328(a), Bankruptcy Rules 2014 and 2016 and Local Rule 2014-1 Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. (Cree, Jennifer)
Related: [-] 423
501 501 utility Corrective Entry Wed 11:48 AM
Corrective Entry ~ To add order to docket Related [+] (LCN)
Related: [-] 500
500 500 2 pgs order Order Wed 11:37 AM
Order Approving the Stipulation Resolving Putative Challenge of the Sabby Noteholders to the Final DIP Order and Related Matters Related [+] Order Signed on 7/11/2018. (SH)
Related: [-] 189 ,336 ,349 ,370 ,380 ,412 ,476
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
499 499 notice Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice Tue 8:06 PM
Notice of Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract Notice of Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Additional Designated Executory Contracts Related [+]. Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 231 ,438 mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Schedule 5.12(a)(ii) Additional Contracts Schedule)
498 498 notice Withdrawal of Document - Notice Tue 8:01 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Additional Designated Executory Contracts Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 496 mming, Andrew
497 497 misc Exhibit Tue 6:54 PM
Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing of Supplemental Schedules to Stalking Horse APA Related [+] Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 231 mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Supplement to Schedule 5.12(a)(ii))
496 496 notice Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice Tue 6:52 PM
Notice of Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract Notice of Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Additional Designated Executory Contracts Related [+]. Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc..
Related: [-] 231 ,438 mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Schedule 5.12(a)(ii) Additional Contracts Schedule)
495 495 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:32 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Twentieth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
494 494 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:29 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Nineteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
493 493 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:27 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Eighteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
492 492 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:24 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Seventeenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
491 491 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:22 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Sixteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
490 490 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:20 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Fifteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
489 489 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:19 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Fourteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
488 488 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:16 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Thirteenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
487 487 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:13 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Twelfth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
486 486 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:10 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Eleventh Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
485 485 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:07 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Tenth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
484 484 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:04 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Ninth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
483 483 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:02 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Eighth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
482 482 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 6:00 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Seventh Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
481 481 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 5:54 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Sixth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
480 480 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 5:47 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Fifth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
479 479 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 5:45 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Fourth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
478 478 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 5:42 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Third Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
477 477 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Tue 5:40 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtor's Second Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Reject Certain Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Orexigen Therapeutics, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/24/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mming, Andrew
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Notice
476 476 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Tue 4:41 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Entry of Order Approving the Stipulation Resolving Putative Challenge of the Sabby Noteholders to the Final DIP Order and Related Matters Related [+] Filed by EcoR1 Capital Fund Qualified, L.P., EcoR1 Capital Fund, L.P.. (Samis, Christopher)
Related: [-] 189 ,336 ,349 ,370 ,380 ,412
Att: 1 Exhibit 1