District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Christopher R Cooper
Case #: 1:18-cv-00560
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2018
Terminated:Oct 30, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Sep 08, 2018 5:29 AM EDT
Defendant
MICHAEL OVITZ
1234 BENEDICT CANYON DRIVE
BEVERLY HILLS, CA 90212
Represented By
Eric M. George
Browne George Ross, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DAN E. MOLDEA
5766 SHERIER PLACE, NW
WASHINGTON, DC 20016
Represented By
Roger C. Simmons
Gordon & Simmons, LLC
contact info
Roger Charle Simmons
Gordon & Simmons, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/24/2020 11:59 PM EST
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/30 11:28 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAN E. MOLDEA. (Simmons, Roger)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 10/30 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'24 stipulation of dismissal, the case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/30/19. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
order Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 10/16 10:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties'23 Joint Motion to Set Deposition of Defendant Michael Ovitz Outside of Fact Discovery Period is GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Defendant's deposition will proceed on November 4, 2019, one week after the Fact Discovery Deadline of October 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/16/19. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
23 23 motion Discovery Tue 10/15 3:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion to Set Deposition of Defendant Michael Ovitz Outside of Fact Discovery Period by MICHAEL OVITZ(Bibbero, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 19, 2019
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Thu 09/19 10:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting22 Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline and Continue the Post-Discovery Conference. It is hereby ORDERED that fact discovery shall conclude on October 28, 2019, and that the post-discovery conference shall take place on November 18, 2019, at 10:00AM. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/19/19. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/19 12:09 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 10/28/2019. Post-Discovery Hearing reset for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2019
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Wed 09/18 5:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline by MICHAEL OVITZ(Bibbero, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, August 30, 2019
21 21 misc Rule 26a2 Statement Tue 09/03 11:36 AM
RULE 26a2 STATEMENT. (ztd); (See docket entry no.20 to view.)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/30 6:36 PM
NOTICE Defendant Michael Ovitz's Expert Disclosure by MICHAEL OVITZ (George, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/31 2:36 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff Dan E. Moldea's Expert Disclosure by DAN E. MOLDEA (Simmons, Roger)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/07 9:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting18 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Carl Alan Roth. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/7/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/03 7:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carl Alan Roth, :Firm- Browne George Ross LLP, :Address- 801 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 1800, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Phone No. - (213) 725-9800. Fax No. - (213) 725-9808 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6102780. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICHAEL OVITZ(George, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Carl Alan Roth ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 30, 2019
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/30 8:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting17 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ira G. Bibbero. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/30/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/26 1:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ira G. Bibbero, :Firm- Browne George Ross, :Address- 2121 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 2800, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Phone No. - (310) 274-7100. Fax No. - (310) 275-5697 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6084637. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MICHAEL OVITZ(George, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ira Bibbero in Support of Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission of Attorney Ira Bibbero Pro Hac Vice
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/02 3:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/2/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/02 3:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion for Amended Pleadings due by 4/23/2019. Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Initial Disclosure due by 5/2/2019. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/31/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 8/30/2019. Post-Discovery Hearing set for 10/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2019
15 15 misc Meet and Confer Statement Fri 03/22 3:16 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (George, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
order Order on Motion to Clarify Tue 03/12 6:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 Motion to Clarify Filing Date for Rule 16.3 Joint Report. The parties shall file their Rule 16.3 Meet and Confer Statement by March 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/12/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/13 10:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 3/22/2019. (znbn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
14 14 motion Clarify Mon 03/11 2:19 PM
MOTION to Clarify re13 MOTION to Clarify Plaintiff Dan E. Moldea's Motion for Clarification of Filing Date for Rule 16.3 Joint Report by DAN E. MOLDEA(Simmons, Roger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
13 13 motion Clarify Mon 03/11 1:59 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . MOTION to Clarify Plaintiff Dan E. Moldea's Motion for Clarification of Filing Date for Rule 16.3 Joint Report by DAN E. MOLDEA(Simmons, Roger) Modified on 3/11/2019 (ztd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of Corrected Docket Entry Mon 03/11 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re13 MOTION to Clarify Plaintiff Dan E. Moldea's Motion for Clarification of Filing Date for Rule 16.3 Joint Report was entered in error per counsel and was refiled as14 . (ztd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
12 12 motion Continue Fri 03/08 12:31 PM
MOTION to Continue Plaintiff Dan E. Moldea's Motion for Continuance of Initial Scheduling Conference and to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by DAN E. MOLDEA(Simmons, Roger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 03/08 3:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Motion to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for March 21, 2019. The Court hereby VACATES that scheduling conference. The Court will assess the need for a scheduling conference once it receives the parties' Rule 16.3 Meet and Confer Statement. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/8/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone Thu 03/07 6:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the initial scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/7/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
11 11 motion Appear by Telephone Tue 03/05 4:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone Ovitz's Counsel at Scheduling Conference by MICHAEL OVITZ(George, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Def's Motion for Counsel to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference
Friday, February 22, 2019
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/22 10:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Susan G. Eisner, :Firm- Gordon & Simmons, LLC, :Address- seisner@gordonsimmons.com. Phone No. - (301) 662-9122. Fax No. - (301) 698-0392 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5960472. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DAN E. MOLDEA(Simmons, Roger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration and Certification of Susan G. Eisner, Esq. in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/22 5:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Susan G. Eisner. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/22/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
9 9 order .Order Thu 02/21 9:06 AM
ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The parties are to appear on March 21, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/21/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 02/21 10:04 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/20 6:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MICHAEL OVITZ.(George, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
7 7 14 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 02/06 1:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re:6 Order denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/6/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 02/06 1:14 PM
ORDER denying3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/6/2019. (lccrc1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
5 5 respm Response to motion Tue 06/05 4:48 PM
RESPONSE re3 MOTION to Dismiss ; Declarations of Michael Ovitz and Adrian Gaeta DEFENDANT MICHAEL OVITZ'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by MICHAEL OVITZ. (George, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
4 4 20 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 05/29 3:38 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re3 MOTION to Dismiss ; Declarations of Michael Ovitz and Adrian Gaeta filed by DAN E. MOLDEA.(Simmons, Roger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
3 3 motion Dismiss Tue 05/15 7:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss ; Declarations of Michael Ovitz and Adrian Gaeta by MICHAEL OVITZ(George, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 [Proposed] Order
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 03/13 6:01 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL OVITZ. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/13 2:03 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/12 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT against MICHAEL OVITZ with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5369398) filed by DAN E. MOLDEA.(Simmons, Roger)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - November 9, 2011 Common Interest Agreement,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons