Acosta v. Gorski et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Levi Russell, III |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00732 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 08, 2018 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Joseph Gorski
|
|
Defendant
Tradeways Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Tradeways, LTD, Simple IRA
|
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Acosta
Philadelphia, PA 19106
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment - Consent
Tue 03/20 2:44 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/19/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Tue 03/13 10:08 AM
MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Alexander Acosta(Brown, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 03/13 10:02 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Alexander Acosta was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - summonses. To correct this problem, file summonses using the event Notice (Other) and link summonses to 1 . (ko, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/12 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alexander Acosta.(Brown, Jessica) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |