Action Nissan, Inc. et al v. Hyundai Motor America et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-00380 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Oct 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 08, 2018 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Genesis Motor America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hyundai Motor America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Action Nissan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Nero
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
appeal
Electronic certificate of readiness
Thu 01/26 11:27 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re:339 Notice of Appeal. All documents are imaged and available for the USCA to retrieve electronically. USCA number: 22-13153 (ER) |