Northwest Environmental Defense Center et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Marco A Hernandez |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00437 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 16:1531 Endangered Species Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 09, 2018 2:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
National Marine Fisheries Service
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marion County
Marion County Legal Counsel's Office 555 Court Street NE P.O. Box 14500
Salem, OR 97309 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
City of Salem
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Native Fish Society
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Northwest Environmental Defense Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WildEarth Guardians
|
Represented By
|
1. | Three environmental groups file lawsuit against federal government over decline in wild salmon (tdn.com) |
Submitted Wed 03/14/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
300 | 300
oth_sup
Declaration
Wed 04/24 3:25 PM
Declaration of CHRIS BAILEY IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS CITY OF ALBANY AND CITY OF SWEET HOMES FRCP 24 MOTION TO INTERVENE . Filed by City of Albany, City of Sweet Home. (Mulvihill, Daniel) |
|
299 | 299
oth_sup
Declaration
Wed 04/24 3:23 PM
Declaration of KELCEY YOUNG IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS CITY OF ALBANY AND CITY OF SWEET HOMES FRCP 24 MOTION TO INTERVENE . Filed by City of Albany, City of Sweet Home. (Mulvihill, Daniel) |
|
298 | 298
motion
Intervene
Wed 04/24 3:20 PM
Proposed Motion to Intervene . Filed by City of Albany, City of Sweet Home. (Mulvihill, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
297 | 297
notice
Notice
Tue 04/23 3:59 PM
Notice re Report294 Comments in Response Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Potter, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Expert Comments |