Unites States Department of Agriculture v. Agricola AAA, Inc. et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel R Dominguez |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01135 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 09, 2018 4:19 AM AST |
Defendant
Agricola AAA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Angel Ramon Alvarez-Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Colon
|
|
Defendant
Ida Ivette Colon-Echevarria
|
|
Plaintiff
Unites States Department of Agriculture
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, September 21, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Mon 09/21 12:00 PM
STIPULATION (Motion Submitting Post Judgment Payment Agreement) by Unites States Department of Agriculture. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
service
Writ Issued
Tue 01/21 3:32 PM
Writ of Execution of Judgment Issued. (Original and one certified copy sent to Juan Frotuno-Fas by regular mail.) (gav) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Execution of Judgment
Thu 01/16 9:28 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion for Execution of Judgment. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/16/2020. (MES) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Thu 01/16 9:21 AM
ORDER denying26 Motion to Reopen Case. Case does not need to be reopened to execute judgment. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/16/2020. (MES) |
|
Wednesday, January 15, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Execution of Judgment
Wed 01/15 4:54 PM
MOTION for Execution of Judgment filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Unites States Department of Agriculture Responses due by 1/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
motion
Reopen Case
Wed 01/15 4:52 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Unites States Department of Agriculture Responses due by 1/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Mon 08/05 10:05 AM
ORDER denying24 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/5/2019. (MES) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 08/02 3:45 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Re:23 Judgment, filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Unites States Department of Agriculture Responses due by 8/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Tue 07/23 2:46 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Court's Opinion and Order (Docket No. 22) granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement (Docket No. 13), the Court hereby enters a final judgment DISMISSING THE INSTANT CASE WITH PREJUDICE.THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL ADMINISTRATIVE AND STATISTICAL PURPOSES.IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/23/2019.(MES) |
|
22 | 22
8
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 07/23 2:41 PM
ORDER granting13 motion for summary judgment. See attached Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/23/2019. (MES) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Tue 07/16 9:38 AM
ORDER noted20 Motion In Compliance. The document submitted is enough for the Court to consider. No need to submit sworn statement. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/16/2019. (MES) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
In Compliance
Mon 07/15 5:26 PM
Motion In Compliance with Order and Requesting Extension of Time as to 19 Order, filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Unites States Department of Agriculture Responses due by 7/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Wed 07/10 2:02 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is to submit no later than July 15, 2019 documents evidencing Plaintiff's demands and collection efforts to collect the debt owed by Defendants prior to commencing the cause of action. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/10/2019.(MES) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 01/31 4:48 PM
ORDER denying16 motion for summary judgment; denying17 motion for summary judgment. Upon adjudicating the pending Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 13), the Court will consider the same as unopposed. The Court has yet to reach a decision on the merits as to the pending summary judgment motion. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/31/2019. (MES) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 01/31 4:24 PM
Third MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Unites States Department of Agriculture Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 2/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 11/29 12:20 PM
Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Unites States Department of Agriculture Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 12/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 10/15 2:54 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by November 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/15/2018. (MES) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 10/15 2:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Summary Judgment as to13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Unites States Department of Agriculture filed by Juan P. Rivera-Roman on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/29/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Roman, Juan) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 09/28 2:46 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Unites States Department of Agriculture Suggestions in Opposition to Summary Judgment due by 10/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Statement of Uncontested Material Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Exhibits to Uncontested M F, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibits to Memorandum | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 06/06 9:45 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Agricola AAA, Inc. (gav) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Tue 06/05 1:17 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Entry of Default. The Court notes that Defendant Agricola AAA is in default as it has failed to answer Plaintiff's complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is to make an entry of default against Defendant Agricola AAA. The entry of default will only be lifted upon filing of an informative motion by Defendant Agricola AAA making an appropriate showing of good cause and upon the filing of its answer to Plaintiff's complaint Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 6/5/2018. (MES) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Default - Entry
Tue 06/05 11:43 AM
MOTION for Default Entry as to Agricola AAA, Inc. filed by Juan C. Fortuno-Fas on behalf of Unites States Department of Agriculture Responses due by 6/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/16 10:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unites States Department of Agriculture upon Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Colon served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/16 9:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unites States Department of Agriculture upon Ida Ivette Colon-Echevarria served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/16 9:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unites States Department of Agriculture upon Angel Ramon Alvarez-Rodriguez served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/16 9:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unites States Department of Agriculture upon Agricola AAA, Inc. served on 4/11/2018, answer due 5/2/2018. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/09 12:07 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Juan P. Rivera-Roman on behalf of Defendant Angel Ramon Alvarez-Rodriguez.(Rivera-Roman, Juan) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/05 1:50 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/4/2017.(gav) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/04 10:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Agricola AAA, Inc., Angel Ramon Alvarez-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Colon, Ida Ivette Colon-Echevarria (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 04/04 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/14 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Unites States Department of Agriculture. Service due by 6/12/2018,(Fortuno-Fas, Juan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit $500,000 Note, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Deed 16, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Title Search, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit $200,000 Note, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Deed 17, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit COI, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit SCRA Angel Alvarez, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit SCRA Ida Colon, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Agricola AAA, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Summons Angel Alvarez, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Isa Colon, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Conjugal Partnership Alvarez-Colon, | ||
Att: 13 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet |