Securities and Exchange Commission v. Holmes et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-01602 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 10, 2018 2:05 AM PDT |
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
44 Montgomery Street Suite 2800
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Elizabeth Holmes
Terminated: 03/27/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theranos, Inc.
Terminated: 03/27/2018
|
Represented By
|
1. | The Blood Unicorn Theranos Was Just a Fairy Tale (bloomberg.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/15/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Relating Case
Mon 07/02 12:43 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 5:18-cv-01602-EJD Securities and Exchange Commission v. Holmes is hereby ordered related to 5:18-cv-01603-BLF Securities and Exchange Commission v. Balwani, and such case shall be reassigned to Honorable Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/2/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
Mon 06/25 3:41 PM
SUA SPONTE REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/25/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 06/25 2:17 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/25/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/15 4:32 PM
SUA SPONTE REFERRAL FOR DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/15/2018. (iym, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Change In Counsel
Thu 03/29 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jason Mark Habermeyer Notice of Withdrawal by Jason Habermeyer (Habermeyer, Jason) (Filed on 3/29/2018) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Judgment
Tue 03/27 4:08 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Theranos, Inc. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THIS FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) Modified on 3/27/2018 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
6
pgs
order
Judgment
Tue 03/27 4:06 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT as to Defendant Elizabeth Anne Holmes. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/27/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/14 4:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Elizabeth Holmes, Theranos, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 03/14 11:27 AM
***EFILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD*** CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018) Modified on 3/14/2018 (ofr, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 03/14 10:46 AM
Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/14 9:18 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
notice
Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
Wed 03/14 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission (Theranos, Inc.)(Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
Wed 03/14 9:14 AM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission (Elizabeth Holmes)(Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 03/14 9:10 AM
Proposed Summons. (Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/14 9:01 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed bySecurities and Exchange Commission.(Chan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |