Miller v. C. R. Bard, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lorna G Schofield |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02317 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 11, 2018 5:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
C. R. Bard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Miller
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
transfer
MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order
Wed 08/15 1:51 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Ohio. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/14/2018) (sjo) |
|
transfer
MDL Transfer Out
Wed 08/15 1:52 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Ohio. (sjo) |
||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Thu 08/16 10:09 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Southern District of Ohio acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:18-cv-00877, filed on 08/15/2018. (sjo) |
||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Fri 08/03 11:28 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Shana E. Russo dated 8/3/2018 re: Status update received decision from JPML. Document filed by C. R. Bard, Inc..(Russo, Shana) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Thu 08/02 12:40 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Shana E. Russo dated 8/2/2018 re: Joint status update from Order dated 4/20/2018. Document filed by C. R. Bard, Inc..(Russo, Shana) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/19 4:11 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shana Eve Russo on behalf of C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Russo, Shana) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Memo Endorsement
Tue 06/19 12:49 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:13 Letter filed by C. R. Bard, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED in part. The matter is stayed sine die pending a decision by the JPML. The parties shall write within 24 hours of receiving a decision or shall file a status letter with the Court on August 3, 2018, whichever is earlier. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/19/2018) (ama) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Mon 06/18 2:32 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel K. Winters dated 6/18/2018 re: Status Update. Document filed by C. R. Bard, Inc..(Winters, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 04/20 5:27 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion to Stay. This Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Stay. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed for 90 days or until a decision to transfer is made, whichever is sooner. By June 20, 2018, the parties shall file a joint letter informing the Court on the status of the JPML's determination as to whether this action should be transferred to another court. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/20/2018) (kgo) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Thu 04/19 2:40 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel K. Winters dated 4/19/2018 re: Motion for Stay on consent. Document filed by C. R. Bard, Inc..(Winters, Daniel) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Thu 04/19 2:38 PM
CONSENT MOTION to Stay . Document filed by C. R. Bard, Inc..(Winters, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit The MDL Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit MDL Motion Supporting Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Second Amended Schedule of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Order dated April 18, 2018, Ochoa v. C.R. Bard, Inc., et al, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, April 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/09 9:47 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff Michael Miller and Defendant C.R. Bard, Inc., that the time for Defendant to answer Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to April 9, 2018. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/7/2018) (mro) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/06 5:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by C. R. Bard, Inc..(Winters, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/05 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Colella on behalf of Michael Miller. (Colella, Alexandra) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/28 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Debra Humphrey on behalf of Michael Miller. (Humphrey, Debra) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Tue 03/27 11:12 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Michael Miller. (Humphrey, Debra) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 03/20 3:28 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/20/2018) (kgo) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/19 5:27 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for C. R. Bard, Inc.. Document filed by C. R. Bard, Inc..(Winters, Daniel) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 03/16 2:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel K. Winters. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 03/16 2:28 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 03/16 2:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 03/16 2:28 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 03/15 4:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Winters, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 03/15 4:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 151478/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14817716).Document filed by C. R. Bard, Inc..(Winters, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint |