New York Eastern District Court
Judge:William F Kuntz, II
Referred: Steven Tiscione
Case #: 1:18-cv-01599
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 11, 2018 5:25 AM EDT
Amicus
Constitutional Law Scholars
Represented By
Brian Burgess
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Gerard J. Cedrone
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elaine C. Duke
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Marutollo
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Marutollo
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Marutollo
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Marutollo
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Marutollo
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Beatrice Beliard
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabina Badio Florial
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Guerline Francois
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachelle Guirand
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Yolnick Jeune
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Haiti Liberte
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Michaud
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Jean Claude Mompoint
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Family Action Network Movement, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Leoma Pierre
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Patrick Saget
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info
Plaintiff
Naischa Vilme
Represented By
Kevin A. Gregg
Kkwtp
contact info
Ira J. Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Christopher James Houpt
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Ferro
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Sejal Zota
National Immigration Project Of The National Lawyers Guild
contact info


1. Haitians in South Florida sue Trump for terminating TPS (tampabay.com)
Submitted Fri 03/16/2018
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
147 147 motion Leave to File Document Wed 4:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document (Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion to Admit the Cover Email for PX 143, Which was Inadvertently Omitted) by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme. (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EMail
146 146 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Wed 3:54 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement136 Proposed Findings of Fact, (Agreed) by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme. (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Wed 4:40 PM
ORDER granting146 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/20/2019. (Kuntz, William)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 4:42 PM
ORDER granting147 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 2/20/2019. (Kuntz, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 15, 2019
145 145 notice Notice(Other) Fri 8:31 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 9) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Deposition of Kathryn Anderson,
Att: 2 Deposition of L. Francis Cissna,
Att: 3 Deposition of Gene Hamilton,
Att: 4 Deposition of Kathy Kovarik,
Att: 5 Deposition of Robert Law,
Att: 6 Deposition of James Nealon,
Att: 7 Deposition of Brandon Prelogar
144 144 notice Notice(Other) Fri 8:25 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 8) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PX 369,
Att: 2 PX 370,
Att: 3 PX 371,
Att: 4 PX 372,
Att: 5 PX 375,
Att: 6 PX 376
143 143 notice Notice(Other) Fri 8:21 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 7) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PX 360,
Att: 2 PX 361,
Att: 3 PX 366
142 142 notice Notice(Other) Fri 8:12 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 6) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PX 329,
Att: 2 PX 330,
Att: 3 PX 331,
Att: 4 PX 332,
Att: 5 PX 334,
Att: 6 PX 336,
Att: 7 PX 338,
Att: 8 PX 339,
Att: 9 PX 340,
Att: 10 PX 341,
Att: 11 PX 342,
Att: 12 PX 344,
Att: 13 PX 345,
Att: 14 PX 348,
Att: 15 PX 350,
Att: 16 PX 351,
Att: 17 PX 352,
Att: 18 PX 355
141 141 notice Notice(Other) Fri 8:05 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 5) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PX 264,
Att: 2 PX 266,
Att: 3 PX 267,
Att: 4 PX 268,
Att: 5 PX 269,
Att: 6 PX 270,
Att: 7 PX 272,
Att: 8 PX 273,
Att: 9 PX 274,
Att: 10 PX 275,
Att: 11 PX 276,
Att: 12 PX 278,
Att: 13 PX 279,
Att: 14 PX 280,
Att: 15 PX 281,
Att: 16 PX 282,
Att: 17 PX 283,
Att: 18 PX 284,
Att: 19 PX 285,
Att: 20 PX 286,
Att: 21 PX 287,
Att: 22 PX 288,
Att: 23 PX 289,
Att: 24 PX 290,
Att: 25 PX 291,
Att: 26 PX 292,
Att: 27 PX 294,
Att: 28 PX 295,
Att: 29 PX 296,
Att: 30 PX 297,
Att: 31 PX 298,
Att: 32 PX 299,
Att: 33 PX 300,
Att: 34 PX 301,
Att: 35 PX 302,
Att: 36 PX 309,
Att: 37 PX 310,
Att: 38 PX 316,
Att: 39 PX 319,
Att: 40 PX 320,
Att: 41 PX 326,
Att: 42 PX 327,
Att: 43 PX 328
140 140 notice Notice(Other) Fri 7:56 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 4) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PX 159,
Att: 2 PX 160,
Att: 3 PX 163,
Att: 4 PX 164,
Att: 5 PX 165,
Att: 6 PX 169,
Att: 7 PX 172,
Att: 8 PX 173,
Att: 9 PX 179,
Att: 10 PX 184,
Att: 11 PX 212,
Att: 12 PX 253,
Att: 13 PX 254,
Att: 14 PX 255,
Att: 15 PX 256,
Att: 16 PX 257,
Att: 17 PX 258,
Att: 18 PX 261,
Att: 19 PX 262,
Att: 20 PX 263
139 139 notice Notice(Other) Fri 7:50 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 3) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PX 143,
Att: 2 PX 144,
Att: 3 PX 145,
Att: 4 PX 147,
Att: 5 PX 148,
Att: 6 PX 149,
Att: 7 PX 150,
Att: 8 PX 151,
Att: 9 PX 152,
Att: 10 PX 158
138 138 notice Notice(Other) Fri 7:44 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 2) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PX 072,
Att: 2 PX 076,
Att: 3 PX 083,
Att: 4 PX 086,
Att: 5 PX 088,
Att: 6 PX 096,
Att: 7 PX 103,
Att: 8 PX 110,
Att: 9 PX 111,
Att: 10 PX 113,
Att: 11 PX 114,
Att: 12 PX 119,
Att: 13 PX 122,
Att: 14 PX 123,
Att: 15 PX 124,
Att: 16 PX 126,
Att: 17 PX 127,
Att: 18 PX 128,
Att: 19 PX 133,
Att: 20 PX 136,
Att: 21 PX 139,
Att: 22 PX 141
137 137 notice Notice(Other) Fri 7:35 PM
NOTICE by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme re136 Proposed Findings of Fact, Notice of Filing Appendices to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (Part 1) (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A,
Att: 2 Appendix B,
Att: 3 PX 009,
Att: 4 PX 011,
Att: 5 PX 012,
Att: 6 PX 015,
Att: 7 PX 016,
Att: 8 PX 018,
Att: 9 PX 022,
Att: 10 PX 025,
Att: 11 PX 030,
Att: 12 PX 036,
Att: 13 PX 037,
Att: 14 PX 039,
Att: 15 PX 040A,
Att: 16 PX 042,
Att: 17 PX 051,
Att: 18 PX 052,
Att: 19 PX 053
136 136 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Fri 4:49 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
135 135 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Trial Brief Fri 1:09 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Elaine C. Duke, Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, United States of America, TRIAL BRIEF - the Government's Post-Trial Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Elaine C. Duke, Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, United States of America (Marutollo, Joseph)
Related: [-]
134 134 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12:28 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11204671. by Beatrice Beliard, Sabina Badio Florial, Guerline Francois, Rachelle Guirand, Yolnick Jeune, Haiti Liberte, Gerald Michaud, Jean Claude Mompoint, Family Action Network Movement, Inc., Leoma Pierre, Patrick Saget, Naischa Vilme. (Nemetz, Miriam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 1:20 PM
ORDER granting134 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice application134 submitted by Miriam Nemetz for Plaintiffs and found it to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the application is approved. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notifications of activity in this case. If not already done, the attorney shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerk's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/15/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]