Microsoft Corporation v. Community Health Ssystems, Inc.
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Eli J Richardson |
Referred: | Jeffery S Frensley |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00291 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 11, 2018 4:00 AM CDT |
Defendant
Community Health Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Microsoft Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 11/27 3:45 PM
ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. (Doc. No.38 ). Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Joint Stipulation sufficed to dismiss this action without any action on the part of the Court. Since this stipulation states that the dismissal is without prejudice, the dismissal is indeed without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(B). Accordingly, the Court acknowledges that this action has been DISMISSED without prejudice effective as of the time of the filing of the Joint Stipulation, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/27/2018. (jm) |
|
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/21 1:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Joint Stipulation) by Microsoft Corporation. (Parsons, William) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 10/29 3:53 PM
ORDER: By Order entered October 25, 2018 (Docket No.36 ), this action was referred to the undersigned as the case manager. In addition to the procedures and deadlines set in the Initial Case Management Order (Docket No.29 ), it is the practice of the undersigned to hold a status conference approximately one month prior to the close of discovery. Therefore, a telephone conference is set for April 2, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the call, and then contact the Court at 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/29/2018. (jm) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 10/26 9:17 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/25/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 10/19 8:29 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to the division of the docket, this case is transferred to Judge Eli J. Richardson. All previously imposed deadlines and court dates remain unchanged, pending any further order from Judge Richardson. District Judge Aleta A. Trauger no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/18/2018. (jm) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 09/19 2:51 PM
ORDER: The undersigned Magistrate Judge conducted a settlement conference in this case on September 18, 2018. The parties met, negotiated in good faith, and reached agreement on a schedule for completing the independent audit referenced in the complaint. No agreement was reached regarding the remaining issues in the case. It appears that nothing further remains to be done by the undersigned Magistrate Judge. The Clerk is directed to return the file to the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 9/19/2018. (jm) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 09/19 9:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant: Settlement Conference held on 9/18/2018. The parties reached an agreement on an important preliminary issue, but not with respect to remaining issues. (tm) |
||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Mon 09/17 5:34 PM
The settlement conference scheduled for September 18, 2018, will take place in Courtroom 776. (vk) |
||
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
3
pgs
misc
Joint Mediation Report
Fri 08/17 12:23 PM
JOINT MEDIATION REPORT filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Parsons, William) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 07/18 2:13 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/18/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (am) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/13 12:40 PM
ORDER: By agreement of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is REFERRED to recalled Magistrate Judge John Bryant for a mediation to be conducted in August or September. Judge Trauger's office will furnish by email to counsel for the parties the instructions on how to contact Judge Bryant in order to schedule this mediation. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/13/18. (afs) |
|
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/13 12:30 PM
ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL: Exhibit List due by 2/18/2020. Witness List due by 2/18/2020. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2020. Bench Trial set for 2/25/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2020 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/13/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (afs) |
|
29 | 29
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/13 12:26 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/13/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (afs) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
minutes
Case Management Conference
Tue 06/12 2:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/12/2018. Joint mediation report due by 8/17/2018. (ds) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/11 4:12 PM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Be Excused from Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/11/18. (afs) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/08 2:09 PM
MOTION to be Excused from Initial Case Management Conference by Microsoft Corporation. (Bowen, Jay) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Proposed Case Management Order
Thu 06/07 4:13 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Parsons, William) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
11
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/31 6:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Community Health Systems, Inc..(Harvey, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 05/24 3:46 PM
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for June 15, 2018 is RESET for Tuesday, June 12, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. It is so ORDERED. ENTER this 24th day of May 2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/24/18. (afs) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/08 10:34 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint Community Health Systems, Inc. answer due 5/31/2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/7/18. (afs) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 05/07 2:44 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Motion to Extend Rule 26(F) Deadlines by Community Health Systems, Inc.. (Harvey, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 04/03 4:43 PM
ORDER: Motion18 GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for 6/15/2018 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/3/18. (afs) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/02 4:17 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Community Health Systems, Inc. answer due 5/7/2018. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/2/18. (afs) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 03/30 2:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Unopposed by Community Health Systems, Inc.. (Harvey, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Continue
Thu 03/29 5:13 PM
MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference (Unopposed) by Microsoft Corporation. (Parsons, William) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/21 4:36 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Community Health Systems, Inc.. (Jacobson, John) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/21 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy G. Harvey on behalf of Community Health Systems, Inc. (Harvey, Timothy) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/21 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Jacobson on behalf of Community Health Systems, Inc. (Jacobson, John) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/19 10:05 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Floyd A. Mandell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/16/18. (afs) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Receipt
Fri 03/16 4:25 PM
RECEIPT #34675049642 in the amount of $400 re1 Complaint. (afs) |
|
12 | 12
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/16 2:49 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Julia L. Mazur to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/16/18. (afs) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/16 1:20 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Microsoft Corporation. Community Health Systems, Inc. served on 3/16/2018. (Bowen, Jay) |
|
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
Fri 03/16 12:34 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/16/18. (afs) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/16 10:04 AM
MOTION for attorney(s) Floyd A. Mandell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2632066) by Microsoft Corporation.(Bowen, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/16 10:02 AM
MOTION for attorney(s) Julia L. Mazur to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2632058) by Microsoft Corporation.(Bowen, Jay) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Fri 03/16 8:17 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (afs) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Thu 03/15 5:15 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Thu 03/15 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (afs) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/15 4:59 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation. (afs) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Sealed Document
Thu 03/15 4:58 PM
Sealed Document - Exhibits to Complaint filed by Microsoft Corporation. (afs) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Leave to File Document under Seal
Thu 03/15 4:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Confidential Information Under Seal by Microsoft Corporation. (afs) |
|
1 | 1
23
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/15 4:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Community Health Systems, Inc., filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Filing fee paid, $400) (afs) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Cover Letter | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 03/15 5:09 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for William V. Parsons, III and Jay Scott Bowen. IL Bar status verified as active for Floyd A. Mandell and Julia L. Mazur. (afs) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Thu 03/15 5:09 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Floyd A. Mandell, Julia L. Mazur: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $75.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 4/5/2018. (afs) |