Emily Capati Gaddi v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02185 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 11, 2018 1:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Western Progressive, LLC
|
|
Defendant
All Persons Unknown
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Emily Capati Gaddi
3605 West Hidden Lane No. 107
Rolling Hills, CA 90274 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Appearance
Fri 05/11 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin S Kim on behalf of Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Attorney Kevin S Kim added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Kim, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 05/02 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of Proposed Judgment re Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,20(Aleali, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Judgment of Dismissal With Prejudice | ||
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 05/01 1:42 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER DISMISSING FOR FAILURE TO OPPOSE12 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re:12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Court grants Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings pursuant to Local Rule 7-12. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 04/30 12:23 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Motion for Judgment as to all causes of action in Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint12 set for 05/01/2018 at 1:30 PM is continued to 05/02/18 at 1:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 04/27 1:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Due to a calendar conflict, the Court, on its own motion, continues the new case status conference from 5/1/2018 to 5/2/2018, at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/24 2:20 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference set for 4/30/2018 is continued to 5/1/2018 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 04/24 2:18 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to all causes of action in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint12 - The Motion hearing is continued from 4/30/2018 to 5/1/2018 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 03/30 3:00 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. New Case Status Conference set for 4/30/2018, at 1:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (smo) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 03/28 10:19 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Initial Status Conference previously scheduled for 04/23/2018 at 3:00 PM has been rescheduled to 4/30/2018 at 01:30 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
For Judicial Notice
Tue 03/27 10:58 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to all causes of action in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 12 filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Aleali, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 5 to RJN ISO MJOP | ||
12 | 12
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 03/27 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to all causes of action in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/30/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/21 11:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only10 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only9 served on March 21, 2018. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 03/21 10:14 AM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 4/23/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/21 10:09 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/19 1:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 served on March 16 and March 19, 2018. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/19 11:02 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/19 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
For Judicial Notice
Thu 03/15 4:48 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Aleali, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/15 4:45 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/15 4:44 PM
Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/15 4:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Aleali, Mike) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/15 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number YC072314 Receipt No: 0973-21420479 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attorney Mike Aleali added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Aleali, Mike) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/19 9:07 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Western Progressive, LLC,All Persons Unknown, Does 1 through 60, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff Emily Capati Gaddi. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/8/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 11 . (et) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/19 10:56 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Persons Unknown, Does 1 through 60, inclusive, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Western Progressive, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Emily Capati Gaddi. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/8/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 31 .(et) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 03/19 11:00 AM
CONFORMED COPLY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 4 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 41 . (et) |