Schirripa v. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02345 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 12, 2018 5:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.
One Maritime Plaza
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The J.M. Smucker Company
1 Strawberry Lane
Orrville, OH 44667 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosemarie Schirripa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
misc
Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer)
Wed 05/09 2:30 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 4:18-cv-02662, filed on 05/07/2018. (sjo) |
||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 05/04 4:50 PM
STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE: NOW, THEREFORE, in consideration of the foregoing, the Parties agree and hereby stipulate to: Transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division, and request that this action be transferred accordingly. All pretrial deadlines shall be stayed pending the Transfer of this action. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/4/2018) (jwh) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Fri 05/04 4:54 PM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of California (jwh) |
||
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/01 6:03 PM
ORDER granting18 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. The stipulation transferring the action to the NDCA shall be submitted no later than Friday, May 4, 2018. All conferences are canceled. All deadlines are adjourned sine die . (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Adjourn Conference Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/30 3:53 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference re: May 3, 2018 pre-motion conference, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ronald Y. Rothstein dated April 30, 2018., JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ronald Y. Rothstein dated April 30, 2018. Document filed by Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., The J.M. Smucker Company.(Rothstein, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Conference
Thu 04/19 5:28 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on May 3, 2018 at 12:00 pm. Plaintiff is directed to submit a written response not longer than 3 pages by 5:00 pm Thursday, April 26, 2018. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 5/3/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/19 5:24 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Jeanifer E. Parsigian to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Conference
Wed 04/18 10:31 AM
LETTER MOTION for Conference , re: request for pre-motion conference in anticipation of motion to transfer action to the Northern District of California, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ronald Y. Rothstein dated April 18, 2018. Document filed by Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., The J.M. Smucker Company.(Rothstein, Ronald) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/11 1:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The J.M. Smucker Company.(Rothstein, Ronald) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/11 1:00 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The J.M. Smucker Company for Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.. Document filed by Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc..(Rothstein, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/10 4:06 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. answer due 5/16/2018; The J.M. Smucker Company answer due 5/16/2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) |
|
Sunday, April 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Sun 04/08 8:04 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint from April 16, 2018 to May 16, 2018, addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Ronald Y. Rothstein dated April 8, 2018. Document filed by Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., The J.M. Smucker Company.(Rothstein, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/29 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Thomas Foglia on behalf of The J.M. Smucker Company. (Foglia, Andrew) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/29 11:58 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald Y. Rothstein on behalf of The J.M. Smucker Company. (Rothstein, Ronald) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Thu 03/29 6:22 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 8 MOTION for Jeanifer E. Parsigian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14871296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) |
||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/28 6:43 PM
MOTION for Jeanifer E. Parsigian to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14871296. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The J.M. Smucker Company.(Parsigian, Jeanifer) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeanifer E. Parsigian, with Certificate, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/19 4:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The J.M. Smucker Company. (jgo) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/19 4:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.. (jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Mon 03/19 11:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul Brian Maslo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Dutchess; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 03/19 11:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 03/19 11:23 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 03/19 11:23 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Mon 03/19 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) |
||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/16 1:05 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore Charles Badala on behalf of Rosemarie Schirripa. (Badala, Salvatore) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 03/16 11:26 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The J.M. Smucker Company, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosemarie Schirripa. (Maslo, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 03/16 11:24 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Rosemarie Schirripa. (Maslo, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/16 11:23 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Maslo, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/16 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., The J.M. Smucker Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14820411)Document filed by Rosemarie Schirripa.(Maslo, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Purchases of dog food |