Goncalves et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Merryday |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-00641 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 12, 2018 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Martha J. Cook
|
|
Defendant
Cooper
|
|
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Laura Goncalves
16613 Vallely Drive
Tampa, FL 33618 |
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Goncalves
16613 Vallely Drive
Tampa, FL 33618 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Wed 05/16 9:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: The plaintiffs move 6 "to reopen-reconsider" this dismissed action. The motion is DENIED. Alleging negligence against a judge of the circuit court for Hillsborough County, Florida, and others, the action is frivolous (the complaint, dismissed for failing to invoke diversity jurisdiction, was subject to dismissal on an array of other grounds) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Reopen Case
Mon 05/14 9:48 AM
MOTION to Reopen Case/Reconsider by Laura Goncalves, Nathan Goncalves. (CTR) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Wed 04/25 2:05 PM
ORDER dismissing the action because the plaintiffs fail to invoke the district court's diversity jurisdiction; directing the clerk to TERMINATE any pending motion and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/25/2018. (BK) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/24 3:44 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Order a Halt on all Proceedings within the Lower Civil Court Case by Laura Goncalves, Nathan Goncalves. (CTR) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
11
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/19 3:15 PM
ORDER re 2 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/19/2018. (GSO) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of designation of track
Mon 03/19 3:14 PM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/16 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Martha J. Cook, Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA049461) filed by Nathan Goncalves, Laura Goncalves.(CTR) |