Match Group, LLC v. Bumble Trading Inc.
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Referred: | Jeffrey C Manske |
Case #: | 6:18-cv-00080 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 12, 2018 3:48 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bumble Trading Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Match Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 18 2020
ORDER DENYING 128 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) |
1. | Tinder's parent company is suing Bumble for allegedly copying Tinder's technology, and now Bumble is suing it right back for allegedly copying its core feature (businessinsider.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/29/2018 | |
2. | Bumble publishes letter in response to Match Group's patent lawsuit (techcrunch.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/20/2018 | |
3. | Tinder sues dating app Bumble (money.cnn.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/19/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 47 minutes ago |
Saturday, June 20, 2020 | ||
207 | 207
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 06/22 8:15 AM
ORDER GRANTING206 Motion to Dismiss. Match Group, LLC (Match) and IAC/InterActiveCorp (IAC) (collectively (Plaintiff and Counter-Defendants) claims against Bumble Trading Inc., Bumble Holding, Ltd., Badoo Trading Limited, Badoo Limited, Badoo Software Limited, and Badoo Technologies Limited2(Defendants) are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendants counterclaims againstPlaintiff and Counter-Defendants are also DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys fees. This is a final judgment. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
206 | 206
4
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Thu 06/18 8:59 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss By All Parties by IAC/InteractiveCorp, Match Group, LLC.(Caldwell, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |