US v. Aaron Graham
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:12-cr-04659 |
Type | criminal / direct criminal |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2012 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2016 |
Amicus Supporting Appellant
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Maryland
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
Center for Democracy & Technology
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
Downsize DC Foundation
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
DownsizeDC.org
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
Electronic Frontier Foundation
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
Gun Owners Foundation
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
Gun Owners of America, Inc.
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
Institute on the Constitution
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press
|
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
United States Justice Foundation
|
|
Appellant
Aaron Graham
|
|
Appellee
United States of America
|
1. | Cops can easily get months of location data, appeals court rules (arstechnica.com) |
Submitted Tue 05/31/2016 | |
2. | Appeals Court Rules Cell Tower Locations Not Protected Information (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/01/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 08/18/2016 12:22 AM EDT |
Wednesday, August 22, 2012 | ||
1 | 1 Criminal case docketed. Originating case number: 1:11-cr-00094-RDB-1. Date notice of appeal filed: 08/21/2012. Case manager: DLett. 12-4659 (DL) | |
2 | 2 ORDER filed [998922333] appointing/assigning counsel. Nunc pro Tunc Date: 08/21/2012. Representation Type: FPD. Copies to all parties... 12-4659 (DL) | |
3 | 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:11-cr-00094-RDB-1.. 12-4659 (DL) |