Malibu Media, LLC v. Nguyen
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00305 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 15, 2018 4:38 AM EDT |
defendant
Nam Nguyen
1494 Dewberry Pl NE, Apt 14
Grand Rapids, MI 49505 |
|
plaintiff
Malibu Media, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 68.49.214.116
Terminated: 06/13/2018
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright
Wed 10/03 8:55 AM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the determination of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ns) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 10/03 8:52 AM
Certified Copy of Order on Stipulation to Dismiss20 sent via U.S. Mail to Nam Nguyen (ns) |
||
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 10/03 9:04 AM
Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright21 , Order20 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (ns) |
||
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation to Dismiss
Tue 10/02 2:55 PM
ORDER granting STIPULATION to dismiss19 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/02 11:41 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 08/08 11:32 AM
Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline),18 sent via U.S. Mail to Nam Nguyen (mg) |
||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause (Deadline)
Tue 08/07 11:20 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant to show cause in writing within 30 days as to why the "answers" should not be stricken from the record and why default should not be entered for failure to plead as required; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/01 12:38 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Nam Nguyen served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018 (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 08/01 9:12 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint9 in letter format by Nam Nguyen (ns) |
|
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 07/27 10:16 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint9 in letter format by Nam Nguyen (anm) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 07/17 1:58 PM
ORDER granting13 second motion for extension of time ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 07/16 6:44 PM
SECOND MOTION for extension of time to effectuate service on Defendant by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC; (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/15 5:07 PM
ORDER granting11 motion for extension of time; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/15 3:51 PM
FIRST MOTION for extension of time to effectuate service on John Doe Defendant by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC; (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/14 1:11 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Nam Nguyen (ns) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 06/13 6:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nam Nguyen filed by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Notice of Impending Dismissal
Tue 05/29 8:16 AM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL as more than 60 days have passed from the filing of the complaint and defendant has not been served; (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 03/22 5:16 PM
ORDER granting2 motion for leave to serve third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright
Tue 03/20 12:42 PM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ns) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Tue 03/20 12:32 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 03/20 12:43 PM
Copy of complaint1 , Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright6 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (ns) |
||
service
Summons Not Issued
Tue 03/20 12:44 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ; none provided (ns) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/19 6:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Supplement
Mon 03/19 6:26 PM
SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to file 2 by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of C. Pelissier, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit P. Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser | ||
2 | 2
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 03/19 6:22 PM
MOTION for leave to file by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC; (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/19 6:15 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 68.49.214.116 filed by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Mon 03/19 6:20 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4083833 (Bernier, Joel) |