Jackson Women's Health Organization et al v. Dobbs et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Carlton W Reeves |
Referred: | F Keith Ball |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00171 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2022 |
Case in other court: | United States Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit, 18-60868 USCA, 19-60455 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 15, 2018 3:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
M.D., Kenneth Cleveland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
M.D., M.P.H., Mary Currier
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mississippi State Board of Medical Licensure
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gerald A. Mumford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wendy Wilson-White
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Shuler Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M.D., M.P.H., Sacheen Carr-Ellis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackson Women's Health Organization
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal lawsuit filed after Mississippi governor signs strict abortion law (jurist.org) |
Submitted Tue 03/20/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |