Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Referred: Jeffrey C Manske
Case #: 6:18-cv-00081
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2018
Terminated:May 16, 2018
Last checked: Thursday May 03, 2018 4:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Tantan Ltd.
Plaintiff
Match Group, LLC
Represented By
John F. Summers
Caldwell Cassady And Curry PC
contact info
Bradley W. Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady And Curry PC
contact info
John P. Palmer
Naman Howell Smith & Lee
contact info
Warren J. McCarty, III
Caldwell Cassady And Curry PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/19/2018 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 12:26 PM
ORDERED that all costs shall be taxed to the party incurring the same. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jch)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
5 5 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 11:23 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Match Group, LLC.(Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
4 4 2 pgs notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley W. Caldwell on behalf of Match Group, LLC (Caldwell, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
3 3 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Tue 9:04 AM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 11:38 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Match Group, LLC. (Palmer, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11:35 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10586095). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Match Group, LLC.(Palmer, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 8:19 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jgb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 8:20 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jgb)
Related: [-]