Jabari v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00872 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 15, 2018 1:56 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rick Jabari
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
17
pgs
orderM
Order Dismissing Case (Multi-Case)
Thu 01/09 7:15 AM
ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20996 in Lead MDL 15-2641 of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/3/20. (MAP) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 03/19 10:40 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV 18-00872 PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/19 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15273893 filed by Rick Jabari.(KAS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |