District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rosemary M Collyer
Case #: 1:18-cv-00622
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2018
Last checked: Monday Sep 03, 2018 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By
Kathleen E. Kraft
Thompson Coburn, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GALEN PENDERGRASS
4005 23rd Parkway Apartment 21
Temple Hills, MD 20748


Docket last updated: 08/22/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
29 29 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 12:43 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by GALEN PENDERGRASS. USCA Case Number 18-7166 (Attachment: #1 order filed January 31, 2019)(zvt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
28 28 order .Order Fri 11:21 AM
ORDER dismissing1 Complaint without prejudice and remanding Mr. Pendergrass's charge to the EEOC. See Order for details. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/8/2019. (DAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
order .Order Thu 3:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER vacating 1/24/2019 Minute Order referring case to mediation. This case is no longer stayed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/7/2019. (DAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12:33 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (DAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 4:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE for Mediation to Magistrate Judge Meriweather for a period of 90 days. This case is being referred with civil case number 15-98. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/24/2019. (DAS)
Related: [-]
order .Order Thu 4:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER staying discovery and all deadlines pending the resolution of mediation. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/24/2019. (DAS)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Thu 4:26 PM
CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather for mediation. (zad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
27 27 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Wed 4:22 PM
RESPONSE re25 Response to Order of the Court filed by GALEN PENDERGRASS. (ztd)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 11:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER suspending discovery in case number 18-cv-622 until the Court issues an Order on the parties' responses to21 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/16/2019. (DAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kathleen E. Kraft (Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
order .Order Tue 10:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER consolidating case numbers 15-cv-98 and 18-cv-622, both captioned Pendergrass v. WMATA, for the purpose of discovery. The Scheduling Order entered in 15-cv-98 on December 14, 2018 shall cover discovery in both matters. The parties are directed to only file documents related to discovery in the docket for 15-cv-98. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/8/2019. (DAS)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC Tue 12:10 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re24 Notice (Other); emailed to kekraft@wmata.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, ECF login must match signature on document. DO NOT REFILE. (znmw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 07, 2019
25 25 respm Response to Order of the Court Mon 5:26 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re21 Order to Show Cause, filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Poplstein, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Thu 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Service by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
23 23 order Protective Order Thu 4:04 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/20/2018. (DAS)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Proposed Order Thu 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Proposed Order by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY(Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
21 21 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 2:55 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. WMATA shall show cause in writing no later than January 7, 2019 why the Court should not find that equitable reasons estop WMATA from challenging Mr. Pendergrass's Complaint on timeliness ground. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/20/2018. (DAS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 3:32 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Show Cause Order due by 1/7/2019. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 1:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 12/13/2018. The Court Will Combine This Civil Action With Civil Case No. 15-098 For Discovery. The Court Will Issue A Protective Order. Defendant To Send Plaintiff Everything Produced In Index Form. The Court Suggests To Plaintiff To Seek Assistance From Counsel In Civil Case No. 14-1289 The Court Will Issue A Scheduling Order. The Court Will Send Hard Copy Of Orders To Plaintiff At His Address Of Record. Telephone Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter LISA MORIERA.) (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 07, 2018
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles M. Poplstein is admitted to represent Defendant Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/7/2018. (DAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charles M. Poplstein, :Firm- Thompson Coburn LLP, :Address- One US Bank Plaza, St. Louis, MO 63101. Phone No. - 314-552-6000. Fax No. - 314-552-7000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5826312. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY(Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Charles M. Poplstein,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
19 19 misc Meet and Confer Statement Wed 5:08 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2018
18 18 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Tue 1:54 PM
RESPONSE re14 Answer to Complaint filed by GALEN PENDERGRASS. (tth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 05, 2018
17 17 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 7:31 AM
***RESUBISSION WITH SIGNED MEMORANDUM & OPINION) Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re15 Notice of Appeal. (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 5:56 PM
USCA Case Number 18-7166 for15 Notice of Appeal filed by GALEN PENDERGRASS. (zrdj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
16 16 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 10:50 AM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re15 Notice of Appeal. (jf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
15 15 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to11 Memorandum & Opinion,12 Order on Motion to Dismiss by GALEN PENDERGRASS. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (jf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 3:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
13 13 order .Order Wed 2:02 PM
ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for December 13, 2018 at 12:30 p.m. The parties' joint report is due December 6, 2018. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/17/2018. (DAS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 4:52 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Meet & Confer Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 4:02 PM
ORDER granting6 Partial Motion to Dismiss. All claims except those arising under Title VII are dismissed. WMATA shall file its answer no later than October 25, 2018. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/11/2018. (DAS)
Related: [-]
11 11 10 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 4:00 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/11/2018. (DAS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 4:09 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 10/25/2018,. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
8 8 respm Reply to opposition to motion Mon 5:11 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and/or 12(b)(6); Precautionary Request for Additional Time to Answer Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of LaShawn Lott (Exhibit A)
Monday, June 25, 2018
9 9 respm Response to motion Tue 12:21 PM
RESPONSE re6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and/or 12(b)(6); Precautionary Request for Additional Time to Answer Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GALEN PENDERGRASS. (zrdj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 24, 2018
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 10:04 AM
ORDER advising Mr. Pendergrass to respond to6 WMATA's Partial Motion to Dismiss no later than June 22, 2018, or the Court may deem the matter conceded. WMATA shall file its Reply no later than July 9, 2018. The Court also denies as moot5 WMATA's Motion for Extension of Time and advises WMATA that its Answer shall be filed no later than 14 days after the Court's decision on the Partial Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/24/2018. (DAS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11:15 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response due by 6/22/2018. Defendant's reply due by 7/9/2018. (jl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
6 6 motion Dismiss Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in Part Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and/or 12(b)(6); Precautionary Request for Additional Time to Answer Complaint , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY(Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order (Motion to Dismiss),
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order (Confirming Tolling of Answer Deadline under FRCP 12(a)(4))
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
order .Order Wed 1:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER requiring Mr. Pendergrass to file his objection, if any, to5 Motion for Extension of Time no later than May 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/16/2018. (DAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 9:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Related [+] by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY(Kraft, Kathleen)
Related: [-] quest for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
4 4 service Summons Returned as to private individual or business Thu 11:09 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY served on 5/2/2018, answer due 5/23/2018 (tth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 12, 2018
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10:13 AM
FIAT ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/12/2018. (zsb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12:21 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (zsb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Tue 3:18 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/7/18. (zsth)
Related: [-]