Spears v. Louisiana College
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00387 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Apr 28, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 16, 2018 4:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
Louisiana College
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn D Spears
|
Represented By
|
1. | Another federal lawsuit against Louisiana College alleges discrimination (thetowntalk.com) |
Submitted Thu 03/22/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |