Farnsworth et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David G Campbell |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00885 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 16, 2018 2:21 AM MST |
Defendant
Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
C R Bard Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Lynn Farnsworth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Farnsworth
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 20 2019
SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Wed 09/11 2:46 PM
Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Utah via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
27
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/27 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re:3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
95
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/22 1:09 PM
SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 03/20 11:57 AM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-885-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/20 11:57 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15285501 filed by Cheryl Lynn Farnsworth, Ken Farnsworth.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |