California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:18-cv-02284
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2018
Terminated:Apr 03, 2018
Last checked: Friday May 04, 2018 2:13 AM PDT
Defendant
James Krug
Represented By
Craig H Marcus
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen And Shapiro LLP
contact info
Patricia L Glaser
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen And Shapiro LLP
contact info
Connie K Chang
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
contact info
Andrew I Baum
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen And Shapiro LLP
contact info
Defendant
Law Office of Krug
Represented By
Craig H Marcus
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen And Shapiro LLP
contact info
Patricia L Glaser
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen And Shapiro LLP
contact info
Connie K Chang
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP
contact info
Andrew I Baum
Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen And Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC
Represented By
Kristina Starr Azlin
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info
Michael T Boardman
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info
Vince L Farhat
Holland And Knight LLP
contact info


1. Lawsuit alleging EB-5 scam at Metropolis is dropped (therealdeal.com)
Submitted Fri 04/13/2018
Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Monday, April 09, 2018
24 24 textonly Notice of Filing Transcript Mon 8:43 PM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/23/18, 9:54 A.M. re Transcript23 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Jui, Chia)
Related: [-]
23 23 transcript -Transcript Mon 8:42 PM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/23/18, 9:54 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Chia Mei Jui, CSR, cmjui.csr@gmail.com or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 4/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (Jui, Chia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
22 22 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Boardman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
21 21 attorney Response to Notice of Fee Due on Pro Hac Vice Application Fri 5:18 PM
RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney PHILLIP M. HUDSON on behalf of Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
20 20 order Temporary Restraining Order Tue 3:23 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order DENYING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery5 . Based on the papers and the arguments of counsel, the Court is further inclined to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for lack of standing. However, to give Plaintiff an opportunity to address the issue in writing, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to Show Cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of standing. Plaintiff's response, if any, is due by 4/5/2018. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
19 19 1 pgs transcript Transcript Order Form (G-120) Mon 4:53 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kristina S. Azlin at kristina.azlin@hklaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Boardman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
18 18 1 pgs minutes Motion Hearing Temporary Restraining Order Fri 5:21 PM
MINUTES OF Hearing Re Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for (1) Temporary Restraining Order (2) Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction and (3) Expecited Discovery5 held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the application under submission. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
Related: [-]
17 17 22 pgs respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 12:53 AM
Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Control and Management of Plaintiff LLC and Expedited Discovery 5 ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants James Krug, Law Office of Krug.(Attorney Connie K Chang added to party James Krug(pty:dft), Attorney Connie K Chang added to party Law Office of Krug(pty:dft))(Chang, Connie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 201 pgs Declaration of James B. Krug in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for: (1) Temporary Restraining Order; (2) Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction; and (3) Expedited Discovery
Thursday, March 22, 2018
16 16 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 3:30 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC, re Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 15 served on March 22, 2018.(Boardman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 12:14 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR (1) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND (3) EXPEDITED DISCOVERY (Dkt. No.5 ) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. In light of Plaintiff's recently filed Application, this Court, on its own motion, hereby sets a hearing for tomorrow, Friday, March 23, 2018, at 9:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve defendants with notice of this hearing and file a Proof of Service, immediately. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 9:18 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
13 13 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89) Wed 11:58 AM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-02284 AB(FFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Wed 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Control and Management of Plaintiff LLC and Expedited Discovery 5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Ex Parte Application. (ghap)
Related: [-]
11 11 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Wed 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Phillip M. Hudson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 10:25 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
8 8 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 11:47 PM
DECLARATION of Phillip Hudson in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Control and Management of Plaintiff LLC and Expedited Discovery 5 filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC.(Boardman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
7 7 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 11:46 PM
DECLARATION of Kristina S. Azlin In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Control and Management of Plaintiff LLC and Expedited Discovery 5 filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC. (Azlin, Kristina)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Declaration (Motion related) Tue 11:44 PM
DECLARATION of Alex Verba In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Control and Management of Plaintiff LLC and Expedited Discovery 5 filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC.(Azlin, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit
5 5 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 11:44 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Control and Management of Plaintiff LLC and Expedited Discovery filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC. (Boardman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC, (Attorney Michael T Boardman added to party LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC(pty:pla))(Boardman, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 5:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Boardman, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 4:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC. (Boardman, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21445295 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC. (Attorney Kristina Starr Azlin added to party LA Metropolis Condo I, LLC(pty:pla))(Azlin, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit