Pedro Jimenez v. Eddie Cheng Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Ronald Sw Lew |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-02286 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 16, 2018 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Eddie Cheng Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Gail Killefer
|
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Jimenez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 10/16 12:16 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Eddie Cheng Corporation.(Fix, Sheila) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 10/15 6:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2018, 10:00 AM, First Street Courthouse, 350 W. First Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Courtroom location to be determined. The conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 16(b). The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference and report to the Court not later than 14 days after they confer as required by F.R.Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre) |
|
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 10/15 5:58 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: Although the Mediator reported on August 28, 2018 that the mediation did not take place due to settlement13 , Defendant subsequently filed an Answer14 on October 2, 2018. Not having heard from the parties as to the status of any settlement, the Court lifts the stay of this action and returns it to the active case calendar. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 10/02 2:51 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Eddie Cheng Corporation, (Fix, Sheila) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 10/02 2:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Eddie Cheng Corporation.(Fix, Sheila) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Not Held - Settled
Tue 08/28 4:35 PM
MEDIATION REPORT filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Gail Killefer: A mediation did not take place because the case settled before the session occurred.(Killefer, Gail) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Mon 08/27 10:18 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for August 30, 2018, at 1:30 p.m.(Killefer, Gail) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement
Mon 08/20 3:32 PM
STATEMENT Defendant's Case Statement filed by Defendant Eddie Cheng Corporation (Fix, Sheila) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22)
Fri 06/15 1:16 PM
ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: GRANTING9 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to EDDIE CHENG CORPORATION dba WENDY'S. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 9/10/2018. (shb) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stay Case and Early Mediation (ADR-21)
Thu 06/07 10:45 AM
APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendant Eddie Cheng Corporation. (Attorney Sheila E Fix added to party Eddie Cheng Corporation(pty:dft)) (Fix, Sheila) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Wed 03/21 10:29 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. SEE NOTICE FOR SERVICE REQUIREMENTS AND FURTHER DEADLINES FOR BOTH PARTIES. (jre) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/21 9:32 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Eddie Cheng Corporation. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/21 9:31 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/21 9:31 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/20 4:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pedro Jimenez, (Hong, Kevin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/20 4:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pedro Jimenez. (Hong, Kevin) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/20 4:47 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Pedro Jimenez. (Hong, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/20 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21445484 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Pedro Jimenez. (Attorney Kevin Hyunjong Hong added to party Pedro Jimenez(pty:pla))(Hong, Kevin) |