Virgil v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03036 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 17, 2018 4:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Unidentified Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Ernesto Virgil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, December 14, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 12/14 9:21 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice- originally filed as rec. doc. 17917 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/10/2020.(lt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Thu 03/22 11:40 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/21 4:27 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (tk) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/21 11:04 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/21 10:28 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6740389) filed by Ernesto Virgil.Attorney Anthony D. Birchfield, Jr added to party Ernesto Virgil (pty:pla).(Birchfield, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., | ||
Att: 6 Summons Janssen Research & Development LLC, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Johnson & Johnson |