Strange v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks, Jr |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00395 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 17, 2018 4:22 AM CDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clinton Strange
7021 Winburn Dr
Greenwood, LA 71033 |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Tue 03/27 2:48 PM
ORDER granting7 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissedwithout prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/27/2018. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Mon 03/26 3:51 PM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Clinton Strange. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby.(crt,ThomasSld, T) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
6 | 6
order
Removal Order
Mon 03/26 12:05 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/26/2018. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/22 11:37 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East L P, Wal-Mart Stores East L P, W S E Investment L L C, Wal-Mart Stores East L L C for Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Edwards, Jerry) Modified to add corporate parents on 3/22/2018 (ThomasSld, T) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Thu 03/22 8:58 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Thu 03/22 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to W Michael Adams, Timothy Russell Wynn, Jerry Edwards on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/5/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 03/21 3:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC. (aty,Wynn, Timothy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/21 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Removal from Shreveport City Court, Case Number 2018S01288 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3611297) filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC.(Attorney Timothy Russell Wynn added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Wynn, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/22 7:49 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Louisiana,LLC. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/22 8:54 AM
CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M) |