23
|
|
23
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/18 4:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/18 3:11 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Watson Laboratories Inc waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/18 1:56 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Actavis Pharma, Inc waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/18 11:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Cephalon Inc waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/18 11:00 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/18 9:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/18 9:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 07/18 12:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/17 12:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/17 12:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/17 12:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/17 12:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/17 11:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Purdue Frederick Company Inc The waiver sent on 7/5/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/17 10:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Purdue Pharma Inc waiver sent on 7/5/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/17 10:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Purdue Pharma LP waiver sent on 7/5/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 07/13 3:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 07/12 2:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by South Bend City of. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 7/6/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
3
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case to MDL
Wed 04/11 9:25 AM
CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) transferring case to Multi-District Litigation 2804 in the Northern District of Ohio before Judge Dan A. Polster. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/10/18. (jld)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Conditional Transfer Order - MDL
Tue 04/10 3:35 PM
(Uncertified) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) transferring case to MDL-2804 in the Northern District of Ohio before Judge Dan A Polster. Signed by Jeffery N Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/10/2018. (jld)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
misc
Docket Annotation - public event with NEF
Fri 03/23 10:03 AM
There were no Proposed Summons submitted with the case. (sct)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/23 10:00 AM
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case) (sct)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/22 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Herceg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Herceg, Manuel)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/22 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chou-il Lee on behalf of City of South Bend, Indiana (Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/22 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3519805.), filed by City of South Bend, Indiana.(Lee, Chou-il)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|