Malibu Media, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 162.207.64.179
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00328 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 18, 2018 4:42 AM EDT |
defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 162.207.64.179
|
|
plaintiff
Malibu Media, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Wed 06/06 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Wed 06/06 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Notice of Impending Dismissal
Tue 05/29 8:17 AM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL as more than 60 days have passed from the filing of the complaint and defendant has not been served; (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 03/27 10:37 AM
ORDER granting2 motion for leave to file; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright
Mon 03/26 4:28 PM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (clw) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Mon 03/26 4:23 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (clw) |
|
service
Summons Not Issued
Mon 03/26 4:25 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 162.207.64.179 (none provided) (clw) |
||
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 03/26 4:29 PM
Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright6 with complaint sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights Copyright Office Library of Congress Washington, D.C. 20559 (clw) |
||
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/22 5:57 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Supplement
Thu 03/22 5:56 PM
SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to file 2 by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of C. Pelissier, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit P. Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration of Erin Sinclair | ||
2 | 2
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 03/22 5:45 PM
MOTION for leave to file by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC; (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/22 5:40 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP Address 162.207.64.179 filed by Malibu Media, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Thu 03/22 5:43 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4088219 (Bernier, Joel) |