Remington Outdoor Company, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10684 |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | May 04, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Remington Outdoor Company, Inc.
870 Remington Drive P.O. Box 1776
Madison, NC 27025 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:34 PM EST |
Attorney
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
|
|
Attorney
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Lazard Freres Co. LLC
|
|
Attorney
Fox Rothschild LLP
919 N. Market Street Suite 1300
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP
|
|
Auditor
Grant Thornton LLP
|
|
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pinellas County Tax Collector
Post Office Box 6340
Clearwater, FL 33758 |
|
Creditor
Wilmington Trust, National Association, as Indenture Trustee
1007 North Orange Street Suite 1110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Latva Machine, Inc.
889 Elm Street, 4th Floor
Manchester, NH 03101 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP C/O John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pollard Class Action Plaintiffs and Class Counsel
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nabholz Industrial
P.O. Box 2090
Conway, AR 72033 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rimini Street, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
SAP America, Inc.
Brown & Connery, LLP Donald K. Ludman, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sports Molding Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arkansas Economic Development Commission
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Anthony & Carol Garnett
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts and Texas Workforce Commission
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Reorganized Remington
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Susheel Kirpalani, Litigation Trustee of the Remington Litigation Trust
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
US Securities and Exchange Commission
100 F Street, NE
Washington, DC 20549 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Office of Unemployment Compensation Tax Services (UCTS) , Department of Labor and Industry, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
|
|
Interested Party
Morris Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Litigation Trustee of Remington Litigation Trust
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ESRT First Stamford Place SPE, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jess D Clark
|
|
Interested Party
City of Huntsville, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cerberus Operations and Advisory Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
K. D. Black
|
|
Interested Party
Ankura Trust Company, LLC, as DIP Term Agent and Term Loan Agent
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Third Lien Noteholders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Term Loan Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ABL DIP Agent
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Deloitte Tax LLP
|
|
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | U.S. gunmaker Remington exits bankruptcy in tough gun climate (reuters.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/17/2018 | |
2. | Remington, one of America's oldest gun makers, files for bankruptcy (money.cnn.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/26/2018 | |
3. | Gun Maker Remington Seeks Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/26/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago |