Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Lurana S Snow
Case #: 0:18-cv-60618
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2018
Terminated:Apr 11, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 19, 2018 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Daniel Adkins
Plaintiff
Hartman and Tyner, Inc.
Leon Cosgrove, LLP Alec H. Schultz and Jeremy L. Kahn 255 Alhambra Circle, Suite 800
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Jeremy L. Kahn
Leon Cosgrove, LLP
contact info
Alec Huff Schultz
Leon Cosgrove LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/19/2019 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 4:35 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/11/2018. (vmz)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hartman and Tyner, Inc. (Schultz, Alec)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Hartman and Tyner, Inc. (Schultz, Alec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
4 4 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 9:46 AM
Order Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/26/2018. (vmz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 23, 2018
3 3 order Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Mon 8:25 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pes)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 8:24 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Adkins. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10511247, filed by Hartman and Tyner, Inc..(Schultz, Alec)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C