Color Switch LLC, et. al v. Fortafy Games DMCC
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Jennifer L Thurston |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00419 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | USCA, 19-15843 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 01, 2018 6:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
Fortafy Games DMCC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Color Switch LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Color Switch Productions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
1
pgs
appeal
USCA Order/Mandate/Memo
Mon 07/20 9:20 AM
USCA MANDATE as to37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. The judgment of this Court, entered June 26, 2020, takes effect this date . (Rivera, O) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
5
pgs
appeal
USCA Order/Mandate/Memo
Fri 06/26 10:53 AM
USCA MEMORANDUM as to37 Notice of Appeal filed by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (Jessen, A) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction
Mon 06/24 1:10 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re41 Notice - Other: Disregard, Attorney Maxwell Herman filed in error. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
41 | 41
1
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/24 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Designation of Record on Appeal by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc.. (Herman, Maxwell) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
misc
Transcript Ordering Form
Tue 05/14 1:15 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. for proceedings held on 7/17/18 before Judge Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Herman, Maxwell) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 04/24 11:06 AM
USCA CASE NUMBER 19-15843 for37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
appeal
Appeal Processed to USCA
Tue 04/23 3:14 PM
APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc.. Notice of Appeal filed *4/23/2019*, Complaint filed *3/26/2018* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *3/29/2019*. Court Reporter: *Karen Hooven*. *Fee Status: Paid on 4/23/2019 in the amount of $505.00* (Gonzalez, R) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Appeal Information | ||
37 | 37
3
pgs
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 04/23 12:59 PM
NOTICE of APPEAL by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. as to34 Order on Motion to Dismiss,35 Judgment.(Herman, Maxwell) |
|
Att: 1 21 pgs Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - Judgment in a Civil Case, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Statement of Representation | ||
36 | 36
3
pgs
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 04/23 12:02 PM
NOTICE of APPEAL by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. as to34 Order on Motion to Dismiss,35 Judgment.(Collins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 21 pgs Exhibit 1 - Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2 - Judgment in a Civil Case, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Statement of Representation | ||
misc
Receipt
Tue 04/23 12:11 PM
RECEIPT number 0972-8223959 for $505.00 for Appeal Filing Fee from Maxwell D. Herman. (Zignago, K.) |
||
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 03/29 2:43 PM
JUDGMENT dated *3/29/2019* pursuant to order34 . (Jessen, A) |
|
34 | 34
20
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 03/29 2:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/29/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A) |
|
33 | 33
15
pgs
misc
Objections
Fri 03/29 6:17 AM
OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. to32 Request for Judicial Notice,.(Collins, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 3 pgs Declaration of Omar Obeidat, | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 12 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 19 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 18 pgs Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 19 pgs Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 1 pgs Declaration of David Reichelt | ||
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
6
pgs
respm
Request for Judicial Notice
Fri 03/08 5:24 PM
REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Fortafy Games DMCC in re9 Motion to Dismiss,.(Smith, Mehrnaz) |
|
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 24 pgs Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 9 pgs Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 6 pgs Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 6 pgs Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 12 pgs Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 3 pgs Exhibit 9 | ||
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
3
pgs
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Thu 02/21 4:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING29 PRO HAC VICE Application of Attorney Maxwell D. Herman for Color Switch LLC and Color Switch Productions, Inc., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2019. (Hall, S) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
misc
Receipt
Thu 02/14 9:58 AM
RECEIPT number CAE100041700 for $225.00 for Maxwell D Herman from Leader & Berkon LLP. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 02/12 4:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE (Text Only). Counsel are reminded, that before the Court may consider admission pro hac vice, they must pay the fee. (Robles, S) |
|
29 | 29
3
pgs
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Tue 02/12 3:03 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. for attorney Maxwell Herman to appear Pro Hac Vice.(Doty, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Certificate of Record Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
4
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/05 3:22 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Emily Kate Doty on behalf of Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc.. Attorney Doty, Emily Kate added. (Doty, Emily) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 01/31 2:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/31/2019: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2019 is CONTINUED to 4/23/2019 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 01/04 1:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/4/2019: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2019 is CONTINUED to 2/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 10/26 11:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2018: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2018 is CONTINUED to 1/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 08/31 9:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/31/2018: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2018 is CONTINUED to 11/9/2018 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
5
pgs
misc
Response
Mon 08/06 3:50 PM
RESPONSE by Fortafy Games DMCC to22 Reply. (Smith, Mehrnaz) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
14
pgs
misc
Reply
Tue 07/31 6:27 PM
REPLY by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. re9 MOTION to DISMISS.(Mefford, Dylan) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration Declaration of Omar Obeidat, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Declaration Declaration of Kyle Sye | ||
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
misc
Transcript Ordering Form
Tue 07/24 10:08 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. for proceedings held on 07/17/2018 before Judge Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Mefford, Dylan) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
19
pgs
misc
Transcript
Fri 07/20 9:03 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7-17-18, Motion to Dismiss before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, filed by Court Reporter Karen Hooven, Phone number 559-264-0584 E-mail karenhooven@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 8/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2018. (Hooven, K) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
misc
Transcript Ordering Form
Wed 07/18 3:59 PM
AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re18 by Fortafy Games DMCC for proceedings held on July 17, 2018 before Judge Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Smith, Mehrnaz) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
misc
Transcript Ordering Form
Wed 07/18 3:39 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Fortafy Games DMCC for proceedings held on July 17, 2018 before Judge Drozd. Court Reporter Karen Hooven. (Smith, Mehrnaz) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 07/17 10:56 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 7/17/2018.9 Motion to Dismiss argued; plaintiffs may file a surreply no more than ten pages in length within two weeks; defendant may submit any case authority in letter form in response to surreply; court will take matter under submission thereafter and issue a written decision. Plaintiffs' Counsel Dylan Mefford and Micahel Collins telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Mehrnaz Smith personally present. Court Reporter: Karen Hooven. (Gaumnitz, R) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minute Order
Thu 07/12 10:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/12/2018; the9 motion to dismiss on calendar 7/17/2018, WILL BE HEARD at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236) at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. Use of any feature(s) that may have an impact upon the quality of voice transmission (such as speakerphones, headsets, etc.) are prohibited; use of a land line or hand-held cell phone is required. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing you must email Courtroom Deputy Renee Gaumnitz, at RGaumnitz@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically. (Gaumnitz, R) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Wed 07/11 3:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING14 Application of Attorney Michael J. Collins to Appear PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/11/2018. (Hall, S) |
|
14 | 14
5
pgs
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Wed 07/11 10:03 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. for attorney Michael J. Collins to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7756258) (Mefford, Dylan) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
20
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 07/10 11:12 PM
REPLY by Fortafy Games DMCC to RESPONSE to9 MOTION to DISMISS.(Smith, Mehrnaz) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration Jaffer Reply Decl., | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit 1-2 to Jaffer Reply Decl., | ||
Att: 3 3 pgs Declaration Ratumaitavuki Reply Decl., | ||
Att: 4 9 pgs Exhibit 1-3 to Ratumaitavuki Reply Decl., | ||
Att: 5 6 pgs Declaration Lejeune Reply Decl., | ||
Att: 6 118 pgs Exhibit 1-10 to Lejeune Reply Decl. | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
11
pgs
respm
Declaration
Tue 07/03 11:44 PM
DECLARATION of David Reichelt in opposition to9 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mefford, Dylan) |
|
11 | 11
31
pgs
respm
Opposition to Motion
Tue 07/03 11:36 PM
OPPOSITION by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. to9 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mefford, Dylan) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 06/13 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/13/2018: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 08:30 AM is CONTINUED to 9/12/2018 at 08:45 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/12 10:35 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Fortafy Games DMCC. Attorney Smith, Mehrnaz Boroumand added. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Smith, Mehrnaz) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Declaration Lejeune ISO Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 3 11 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 10 pgs Exhibit C | ||
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 05/21 11:22 AM
ORDER GRANTING7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Service of Process via Alternative Means, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/21/2018. (Hall, S) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
14
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/23 4:14 PM
MOTION Alternative Service by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc..(Mefford, Dylan) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Declaration | ||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
misc
Copyright New Case Documents for DAD
Wed 03/28 12:11 PM
COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* PA1-992-830 * * Color Switch * * Color Switch Productions, Inc. * Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Copyright Report, | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs VDRP | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/28 12:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc.. (Mefford, Dylan) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/28 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Lodging of Copyright Registration by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc..(Mefford, Dylan) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Ex. A - Copyright Registration | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Summons
Wed 03/28 9:14 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Fortafy Games DMCC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dylan Johnston Mefford* *Brewer Attorneys & Counselors* *1717 Main Street, Suite 5900* *Dallas, TX 75201*. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs CIVIL COVER SHEET by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. (Mefford, Dylan) | |
1 | 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT against Fortafy Games DMCC by Color Switch LLC, Color Switch Productions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7574452). (Mefford, Dylan) |