Armijos et al v. Senator Construction Group, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Lehrburger |
Referred: | Robert W Lehrburger |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02779 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 25, 2018 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
Muhammad Usman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Senator Construction Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Haroon Contracting Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Senator Construction Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Atiq Rehman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adalberto Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco Pineda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Giovanny Manosalva
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricio Toalongo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omar Del Razo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Caraizaca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pedro Pachay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
German Armijos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
69 | 69
order
Memo Endorsement
Thu 01/23 1:42 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:68 Letter filed by German Armijos. ENDORSEMENT: Dkt 67 is withdrawn. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 1/23/2020) (mml) |
|
68 | 68
misc
Letter
Thu 01/23 10:21 AM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Jacob Aronauer dated 01/23/2020 re: Withdrawal. Document filed by German Armijos.(Aronauer, Jacob) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
67 | 67
motion
Reopen Case
Tue 01/21 9:29 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Jacob Aronauer dated 01/21/2020. Document filed by German Armijos.(Aronauer, Jacob) |