Washington et al v. Accord Healthcare, Inc. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03441 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1407 Products Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 26, 2018 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
235 E 42nd Street,
New York, NY 10017 |
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
100 College Road West
Princeton, NJ 08540 |
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
55 Corporate Drive,
Bridgewater,, NJ 08807 |
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Wendall Washington
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 12/28 4:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Filed at Rec. Doc. 5644 in 16-MD-2740).(ecm) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 05/23 9:50 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 04/10 12:57 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/02 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. (sbs) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 03/30 1:18 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/30 12:56 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6763857) filed by Leatha Washington, Wendall Washington.Attorney Debra Humphrey added to party Leatha Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Debra Humphrey added to party Wendall Washington(pty:pla).(Humphrey, Debra) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons |