Energy Harbor LLC and Pleasants Corp.
Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Alan M Koschik |
Case #: | 5:18-bk-50757 |
Case Filed: | Mar 31, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 16, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
FirstEnergy Solutions Corp.
341 White Pond Dr Bldg B3
Akron, OH 44320-1119 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:35 PM EST |
Accountant
BDO USA, LLP
|
|
Attorney
Calfee, Halter & Griswold LLP
The Calfee Building 1405 East Sixth Street
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
EnergySolutions, LLC
222 South Main Street Suite 2200
Salt Lake City, UT 84101 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur LLP
41 South High Street Suite 3100 Attn: Robert L. Brubaker
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
STATE OF OHIO DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
David Lynn Yaussy
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Brouse McDowell, LPA
388 S. Main Street, Suite 500
Akron, OH 44311 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP
660 Woodward Ave 2290 First National Building
Detroit, MI 48226 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Ropes & Gray LLP
|
|
Attorney
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
|
Represented By
|
Consultant
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Creditor
ASHTA Chemicals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Holders of the 6.85% Pass Through Certificates Due 2034
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Noteholder Group
Key Tower 127 Public Square Suite 2000
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Allegheny Ridge Wind Farm, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BNSF Railway Company
2500 Lou Menk Drive AOB-3
Fort Worth, TX 76131 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blue Creek Wind Farm LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Buckeye Power, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Burns & McDonnell
605 W. 47th Street Suite 350
Kansas City, MO 64112 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Casselman Windpower LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chemsteel Construction Company
200 Public Square, Suite 3000
Cleveland,, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Norton
3930 Fulton Drive NW Suite 100B
Canton, OH 44718 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commerzbank AG
1301 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
Office of Attorney General 5th Floor, Manor Complex 564 Forbes Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
ERM-West, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ellwood Group, Inc.
Tucker Arensberg, PC c/o Danielle L. Dietrich 1500 One PPG Place
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
High Trail Wind Farm, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 1413, AFL-CIO
PO Box 122
Oak Harbor, OH 43449 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 245, AFL-CIO
705 Lime City Road
Rossford, OH 43460 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 272, AFL-CIO
838A Midland Avenue 2nd floor
Midland, PA 15059 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 29, AFL-CIO
986 Greentree Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15220 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Louisiana Energy Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Marcus Thomas LLC
3930 Fulton Drive NW Suite 100B
Canton, OH 44718 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Maryland Solar LLC c/o Farella Braun + Martel LLP
235 Montgomery Street 17th floor
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
MetLife Capital, Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Midwest Independent System Operator, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mirion Technologies (MGPI), Inc
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Murray Energy Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Labor Relations Board
Contempt, Compliance & Special Litigatio 1015 Half Street SE Fourth Floor
Washington, DC 20003 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Department of Taxation and Ohio Bureau of Wokers' Compensation
PO Box 530
Columbus, OH 43216 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Valley Electric Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PJM Interconnection, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PJM Settlement, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Panhandle Cleaning and Restoration
42 38th Street
Wheeling, WV 26003 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Department of Environmental Protection
Southwest Regional Office 400 Waterfront Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
PA Office of Attorney General 564 Forbes Avenue 6th Floor Manor Complex
Pittsburgh, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Office of the General Counsel 1200 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
South Side Area School District
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
State of Ohio EPA and ODNR
30 E. Broad Street 25th floor
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Suprock Technologies LLC
254 Commercial Street
Portland, ME 04101 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Andersons, Inc.
FisherBroyles, LLP 27100 Oakmead Drive #306
Perrysburg, OH 43551 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., as Trustee for Certain Bonds and Notes
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Traxys North America LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank Trust National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UMB Bank, National Association, as successor indenture trustee for certain secured pollution control notes and bonds issued by FirstEnergy Generation, LLC and FirstEnergy Nuclear Generation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
URENCO Deutschland GmbH
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
URENCO Enrichment Company Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
URENCO Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
URENCO Nederland B.V.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
URENCO UK Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Utility Workers Union of America, Local 351, AFL-CIO
11594 Baird Road
Amherst, OH 44001 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Utility Workers Union of America, Local 457, AFL-CIO
PO Box 146
Stratton, OH 43961 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ABC-Amega, Inc.
500 Seneca Street Suite 400
Buffalo, NY 14204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Appendix R Solutions, Inc.
Dickinson Wright, PLLC c/o Doron Yitzchaki 350 S. Main Street Suite 300
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Argo Partners
12 W 37th Street 9th Fl.
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BNB Napoleon Solar, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Beaver County Airport
Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky Four Gateway Center 444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 2200
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue Suite 240
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Canyon Distressed Opportunity Master Fund II, LP
2000 Avenue of the Stars 11th floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
|
Creditor
Canyon NZ-DOF Investing, LP.
2000 Avenue of the Stars 11th floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
|
Creditor
Canyon-EDOF (Master) LP
2000 Avenue of the Stars 11th floor
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Labor and Industry
Collections Support Unit 651 Boas Streeet Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121 |
|
Creditor
DTE ES Operations, LLC
414 S. Main Street Suite 600
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DTE REF Management Company, LLC
414 S. Main Street Suite 600
Ann Arbor, MI 48104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dear John Inc.
1618 State Route 65
Ellwod City, PA 16117 |
|
Creditor
Duquesne Light Company
c/o Bernstein-Burkley, P.C.
707 Grant St., Suite 2200, Gulf Tower, PA 15219 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
FES Creditor Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
Luz Gongora
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Human Resources Consulting
1561 Oxford Court
Gallatin, TN 37066 |
|
Creditor
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA
Mail Code: NY1-E054 4 New York Plaza floor 15
New York, NY 10004 |
|
Creditor
Kebco, Inc.
175 Heritage Valley Drive
Springville, AL 35146 |
|
Creditor
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Meadville Forging Company, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Meyersdale Windpower, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carol L. Muto
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
James J. Muto
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PA Department of Revenue Office of Attorney General
Office of Attorney General 1251 Waterfront Place Mezzanine Level
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Primeshares
261 Fifth Avenue 22nd floor
New York, NY 10016 |
|
Creditor
Radiological Solutions Inc.
1840 Moen Avenue Suite A
Rockdale, IL 60436 |
|
Creditor
Rexel USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rocky Point Claims LLC
PO Box 165
Norwalk, CT 06853 |
|
Creditor
James E. Rupert
1429 Walnut Street #300
Philadelphia, PA 19102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Schneider Downs Meridian, LP, as Receiver for Krayn Wind, LLC
1500 One PPG Place
Pittsburgh,, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Scoggin International Fund, Ltd.
|
|
Creditor
Studer Industrial Tool, Inc.
4500A New Texas Road
Pittsburgh, PA 15239 |
|
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund, LP
555 Theodore Fremd Ave. Suite C-209
Rye, NY 10580 |
|
Creditor
United States of America, IRS
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WesTech Engineering Incorporated
23 South Main Street 3rd floor
Akron, OH 44308 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
BNSF Railway Company
2500 Lou Menk Drive AOB-3
Fort Worth, TX 76131 |
|
Creditor Committee
Enerfab Power & Industrial, Inc
300 Bursca Drive Suite 302
Bridgeville, PA 15017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 272
838A Midland Ave, 2nd Floor
Midland, PA 15059 |
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
PKMJ Technical Services, Inc. dba Rolls-Royce
410 Rouser Road
Moon Township, PA 15108 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Schwebel Baking Company
965 East Midlothian Blvd
Youngstown, OH 44502 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA
500 Ross St, 12th Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15262 |
|
Creditor Committee
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, as Trustee
500 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Creditor Committee
Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
FTI Consulting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
AP Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP
200 Public Square Suite 2300
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
|
Interested Party
Board of Directors of FirstEnergy Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Curtiss-Wright Electro-Mechanical Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Company Canada
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Service Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Curtiss-Wright Flow Control Service, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Large Retail Customer Committee
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
EST Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Environmental Defense Fund
|
|
Interested Party
Environmental Law and Policy Center
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
First Solar, Inc.
Attn: Gary M. Kaplan 235 Montgomery Street 17th floor
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 272
223 Fourth Avenue 4th floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Krayn Wind LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Marnen Mioduszewski Bordonaro Wagner & Sinnott
516 West 10th Street
Erie, PA 16502 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
North Allegheny Wind, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Nova Machine Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Office and Professional Employees International Union, Local 19, AFL-CIO/CLC
2300 Ashland Avenue Suite 224A
Toledo, OH 43620 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ohio Citizen Action
|
|
Interested Party
Ohio Environmental Council
|
|
Interested Party
Prime Clerk LLC
830 3rd Avenue 9th floor
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Interested Party
The Office of the Ohio Consumers Counsel
280 North High Street Suite 1300
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission
175 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 1450
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States Securities and Exchange Commission
175 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 1450
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States on behalf of the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States on behalf of the the U.S. Department of Energy
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Utility Workers Union of America, Local 270, AFL-CIO
1400 East Schaaf Road
Brooklyn Heights, OH 44131 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bradford Capital Management, LLC
Bradford Capital Management, LLC 1051 Bloomfield Avenue Suite 10
Clifton, NJ 07012 |
|
Interested Party
Duke Energy Ohio, Inc.
139 East 4th Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Exelon Generation Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
FirstEnergy Corp.
Jones Day c/o Heather Lennox 901 Lakeside Ave
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
HSBC Bank plc
|
|
Interested Party
Michael D. Lorton
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Marble Ridge Master Fund LP
|
|
Interested Party
Office of the Ohio Attorney General, acting on behalf of the Ohio Environmental Protection Agency and the Ohio Department of Natural Resources
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ohio Consumers' Counsel
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sierra Club
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States on behalf of U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States on behalf of U.S. Nuclear Regulatory Commission
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States on behalf of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and the U.S. Nuclear Regulatory Commission
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Vermillion Power L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Walleye Power, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
1000 Town Center, Suite 750
Southfield, MI 48075 |
|
Other Prof.
Babst Calland Clements & Zomnir, P.C.
|
|
Other Prof.
Black McCuskey Souers & Arbaugh, LPA
220 Market Ave. S Suite 1000
Canton, OH 44702 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Dewey Square Group, LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Esty & Associates
|
|
Other Prof.
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
200 Park Ave
New York, NY 10166 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Harrington, Hoppe & Mitchell, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
ICF Resources, LLC
9300 Lee Highway
Fairfax, VA 22031 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
J.E. Cichanowicz, Inc.
|
|
Other Prof.
Jackson Kelly PLLC
|
|
Other Prof.
KPMG LLP
200 E Randolph Street, Suite 5500
Chicago, IL 60601 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Lanier Consulting, LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Lazard Freres & Co LLC
300 N LaSalle Street 23rd Floor
Chicago, IL 60654 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Litchfield Cavo, LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Loomis Ewert Parsley Davis & Gotting PC
124 W. Allegan St Suite 700
Lansing, MI 48933 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Timothy P. Matthews
|
|
Other Prof.
Penny Legal, LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Persun & Hamlin, PC
1700 Bent Creek Blvd Suite 160
Mechanicsburg, PA 17050 |
|
Other Prof.
Philip Elwell Troy, Esq.
|
|
Other Prof.
Prime Clerk
830 Third Ave 9th Fl
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Other Prof.
Rawle & Henderson LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Roetzel & Andress
222 South Main Street
Akron, OH 44308 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Ross Brittain & Schonberg, Co., LPA
Rockside Woods Blvd., South Suite 350
Cleveland, OH 44236 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Scanlon, Howley & Doherty, P.C.
|
|
Other Prof.
Sitrick and Company, Inc
11999 San Vicente Blvd., Penthouse
Los Angeles, CA 90049 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
The Brattle Group, Inc.
|
|
Other Prof.
The Levicoff Law Firm, P.C.
4 PPG Place, Suite 200
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Wilkinson Barker Knauer LLP
1755 Blake Street Suite 470
Denver, CO 80202 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Argent Group Ltd.
|
|
Other Prof.
Day Pitney LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Direct Fee Review LLC
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Experis US, Inc.
|
|
Other Prof.
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Hogan Lovells US LLP
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz LLP
1375 E. 9th Street 29th Floor
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Other Prof.
Navigant Consulting, Inc.
|
|
Other Prof.
PJT Partners LP
280 Park Ave
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Ridge Policy Group LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
The Boston Consulting Group, Inc.
|
|
Other Prof.
The Oxley Group
81 South 5th St. Suite 200
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Other Prof.
Van Meter, Ashbrook & Associates
|
|
Spec. Counsel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Cleveland, OH 44114
|
Represented By
|
1. | FirstEnergy Strikes Creditor Deal in Subsidiary Bankruptcies (wsj.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/24/2018 | |
2. | FirstEnergy Generation Units File for Bankruptcy After Seeking Federal Bailout (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/02/2018 | |