State Of New York et al v. United States Department of Commerce et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02921 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 30, 2018 4:48 AM EDT |
ADR Provider
Donald S. Beyer, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
ADR Provider
City of Phoenix
Office of the City Attorney 200 W. Washington Suite 1300
Phoenix, AZ 85003 |
Represented By
|
ADR Provider
Project on Fair Representation
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Center for Law and Justice
American Center for Law & Justice 3001 Plymouth Road, Suite 203
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Nanette Diaz Barragan
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Michael F. Bennet
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Howard Berman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Earl Blumenauer
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Attorney General Richard Blumenthal
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Cory A. Booker
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Anthony G. Brown
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Michael Capuano
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Salud O. Carbajal
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tony Cardenas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Andre Carson
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Judy Chu
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
David N. Cicilline
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Yvette D. Clarke
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Wm. Lacy Clay
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Emanuel Cleaver, II
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
James Clyburn
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Steve Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Gerrold Connolly
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
J. Luis Correa
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Joe Courtney
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Congressman Joe Crowley
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Henry Cuellar
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Elijah E. Cummings
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Danny K. Davis
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Diana DeGette
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rosa L. DeLauro
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mark DeSaulnier
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John K. Delaney
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Ted Deutch
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Debbie Dingell
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tammy Duckworth
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Richard J. Durbin
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Keith Ellison
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Eliot L. Engel
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Adriano Espaillat
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Elizabeth Esty
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Federation for American Immigration Reform
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Bill Foster
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Lois Frankel
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Marcia L. Fudge
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Ruben Gallego
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jimmy Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Gene Greene
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Raul M. Grijalva
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Luis V. Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Colleen Hanabusa
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Kamala D. Harris
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Alcee L. Hastings
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mazie K. Hirono
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Steny H. Hoyer
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Sheila Jackson Lee
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Pramila Jayapal
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Hakeen Jeffries
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Henry C. "Hank&q Johnson, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Ro Khanna
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Ruben J. Kihuen
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Daniel T. Kildee
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John B. Larson
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Brenda L. Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Barbara Lee
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John Lewis
650 Crown Street Apartment 2-C
Brooklyn, NY 11213 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Zoe Lofgren
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Alan Lowenthal
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Nita Lowey
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Michelle Lujan Grisham
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Congresswoman Carolyn Maloney
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Doris Matsui
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Betty McCollum
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
A. Donald McEachin
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
James P. McGovern
P.O. Box 48
Georgetown, CT 06829 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Gregory Meeks
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Grace Meng
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Gwen Moore
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Constance Morella
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jerrold Nadler
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Grace F. Napolitano
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Bill Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Rick Nolan
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Donald Norcross
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Eleanor Holmes Norton
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Frank Pallone, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jimmy Panetta
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Bill Pascrell, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Hon. Nancy Pelosi
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Ed Perlmutter
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Chellie Pingree
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mark Pocan
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jared Polis
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John Porter
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
David E. Price
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Public Interest Legal Foundation, Inc.
32 E Washington Street Suite 1675
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mike Quigley
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jamie Raskin
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Kathleen M. Rice
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jacky Rosen
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Lucille Roybal-Allard
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Bobby L. Rush
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Linda T. Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John Sarbanes
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Janice D. Schakowsky
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Brian Schatz
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Claudine Schneider
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jose Serrano
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Brad Sherman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Albio Sires
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Adam Smith
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Peter Smith
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Darren Soto
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jackie Speier
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of California
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Mark Takano
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Bennie G. Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Dina Titus
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Norma J. Torres
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Juan Vargas
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Filemon Vela
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Nydia M. Velazquez
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Tim Walz
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Debbie Wasserman Schultz
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Bonnie Watson Coleman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Henry A. Waxman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Peter Welch
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Ron Wyden
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
John Yarmuth
|
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
ADC Research Instittue
1705 DeSales Street, NW Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036 |
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Arab-American Anti-Discrimination Committee
1705 DeSales Street, NW Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036 |
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
CASA de Maryland
8151 15th Avenue
Langley Park, MD 20783 |
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
Make the Road -- New York
301 Grove Street
Brooklyn, NY 11237 |
Represented By
|
Consolidated Plaintiff
New York Immigration Coalition
131 West 33rd Street #610
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Commerce
1401 Constitution Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20230 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bureau of the Census
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ron S. Jarmin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wilbur L. Ross, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Diana Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lauren Rachel Berman
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sarah Bryan
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Alejandro Chavez
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Virginia Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Michael Kagan
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Michael Kravitz
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Robyn Kravitz
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
La Union Del Pueblo Entero Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
Julia Alejandra Gomez Hernandez
Maldef (mexican American Legal Defense And Educational Fund) contact info |
Interested Party
Yamile Labori
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lazara Yoelvis Magadan
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Richard McCune
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jose Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Catherine Nwosu
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Nnabugwu Nwosu
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Linda Rivas
279 Lincoln Road Apt. 6
Brooklyn, NY 11225 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
T. Carter Ross
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Martha Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sonia Casarez Shafer
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Joanne Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
Black Alliance for Just Immigration
|
Represented By
|
Miscellaneous
City Of San Jose
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Muslim Advocates
|
Represented By
|
Movant
National Association of Latino Elected and Appointed Officials
|
Represented By
|
Movant
National Coalition on Black Civic Participation
|
Represented By
|
Movant
The Leadership Conference Education Fund
|
Represented By
|
Movant
The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City and County of San Francisco
San Francisco City Attorney's Office 1 Dr. Carlton B. Goodlett Place
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Chicago
City of Chicago Law Department 30 N. LaSalle Street, Suite 1230
Chicago, IL 60602 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Philadelphia
City of Philadelphia Law Department 1515 Arch Street, 17th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Providence
444 Westminster Street
Providence, RI 02903 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Seattle
701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2050
Seattle, WA 98104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Massachusetts Attorney General's Office One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Office of the Attorney General 16th Floor, Strawberry Square
Harrisburg, PA 17120 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Virginia
Virginia Attorney General's Office 202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
District of Columbia
Distict of Columbia Attorney General's Office 441 4th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State Of Connecticut
Office of the Attorney General P.O. Box 120 55 Elm Street
Hartford, CT 06106 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State Of New York
New York Attorney General Civil Rights Bureau 28 Liberty, 20th Flr.
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Delaware
Delaware Attorney General's Office Carvel State Building, 6th Flr.
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
Illinois Attorney General's Office 100 W. Randolph Street
Chicago, IL 60601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Iowa
Iowa Attorney General's Office 1305 E. Walnut St.
Des Moines, IA 50319 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
Maryland Attorney General's Office 200 St. Paul Place, 20th Flr.
Baltimore, MD 21202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
Minnesota Office of the Attorney General 445 Minnesota Street Suite 1100
St. Paul, MN 55101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
New Jersey Attorney General's Office Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex 25 Market Street, 8th Floor, West Wing
Trenton, NJ 08625 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New Mexico
New Mexico Attorney General's Office 408 Galisteo St.
Santa Fe, NM 87501 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of North Carolina
North Carolina Department of Justice 114 W. Edenton Street
Raleigh, NC 27603 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Rhode Island
Rhode Island Attorney General's Office 150 South Main Street
Providence, RI 02903 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Vermont
Office of the Attorney General 109 State Street
Montpelier, VT 05609 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Washington
Office of the Attorney General State of Washington P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States Conference of Mayors
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW Third Floor
Washington, DC 20036 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City Of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Central Falls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Columbus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Pittsburgh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Cameron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of El Paso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Hidalgo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
County of Monterey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Colorado
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal court blocks Trump administration's plan to add a citizenship question to 2020 census (cnbc.com) |
Submitted Tue 01/15/2019 | |
2. | Judge allows lawsuit against citizenship question on the 2020 census to proceed (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Fri 07/27/2018 | |
3. | Minnesota joins lawsuit against new census citizenship question (startribune.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/05/2018 | |
4. | Oregon Joins 17 Other States in Lawsuit Aimed at Blocking Citizenship Question on 2020 Census (wweek.com) |
Submitted Tue 04/03/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
705 | 705
![]() INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:574 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. (sjo) |
|
704 | 704
![]() INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:574 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. (sjo) |
|
703 | 703
![]() INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:574 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. (sjo) |
|
702 | 702
![]() INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:574 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. (sjo) |
|
701 | 701
![]() INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:574 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. (sjo) |
|
700 | 700
![]() INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:574 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. (sjo) |
|
699 | 699
![]() INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:574 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. (sjo) |