Selden v. Unknown Defendant
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | John E Steele |
Referred: | Carol Mirando |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00219 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Judgment - prisoner
Tue 05/22 10:53 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SLU) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order dismissing case
Mon 05/21 10:11 AM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/21/2018. (RKR) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Quash
Fri 04/27 4:04 PM
MOTION to quash abolish by Glenn Lee Selden.(SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Mailing Envelope | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of appearance
Fri 04/27 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Lee Selden.(SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Mon 04/23 3:43 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. Unknown filed by Glenn Lee Selden.(SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
4 | 4
utility
*Remark
Mon 04/23 3:31 PM
ACTION brought by U.S. Trustee by Glenn Lee Selden. (SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Mon 04/23 3:20 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Glenn Lee Selden. Related case(s): yes(SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Fri 04/06 4:46 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/20/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/6/2018. (jmc) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/04 1:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Unknown Defendant filed by Glenn Lee Selden. (no fee/ifp; no service copy)(SLU) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope |