Wahidullah Medical Corp. v. St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-02074 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 02, 2018 1:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Providence St. Joseph Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Petra Kuhfahl
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Allan Wilke
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Miriam Steinberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Joseph Heritage Healthcare
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Joseph Health System
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Joseph Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alexey Shereshevsky
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Providence St. Joseph Health Network
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leo Leer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven Korenstein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bruce Kessler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda James
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Humboldt Medical Specialists, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory Holst
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rachel Hatchimonji
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robin Fraser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amber Flowers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caroline Connor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stuart Cataldo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Aryunpur
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wahidullah Medical Corp
|
Represented By
|
1. | St. Joseph Health Hit with Anti-Trust Lawsuit Alleging Unfair Business Practices to Protect 10-fold Price Markeups (northcoastjournal.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/23/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 04/19 11:09 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/09 10:56 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wahidullah Medical Corp.. (Clayton, Patrick) (Filed on 4/9/2018) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/05 3:42 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2018 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/05 2:53 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 04/05 1:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wahidullah Medical Corp. d/b/a Redwood Urgent Care and Laboratory re1 Complaint, (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/5/2018) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/05 12:48 PM
Proposed Summons. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/5/2018) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/05 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12249623.). Filed byWahidullah Medical Corp. d/b/a Redwood Urgent Care and Laboratory.(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/5/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |