Nine West Holdings, Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-10947 |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 26, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 27, 2019 |
Debtor
Nine West Holdings, Inc.
1411 Broadway
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 16, 2019 5:51 PM EST |
Attorney
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
One Bryant Park
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
830 3rd avenue
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
525 Delaware LLC
26 Broadway, 17th Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
AVR-Portchester, LLC
300 Garden City Plaza, 5th Floor
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Certain Unsecured Noteholders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Crossover Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Allen ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Amalgamated National Health Fund
333 WESTCHESTER AVE NORTH BLD First Floor
WHITE PLAINS, NY 10604 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Argo Partners
12 West 37th Street, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arlington ISD
500 E Border Street Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Zucker & Sharfstein, LLP 1201 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aurelius Capital Management, LP and its Affiliates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bloomfield Holdings, LLC
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bristol 1031 DST
Attn: Kevin M. Newman, Esq. 308 Maltbie Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
Camuto Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Centerbridge Partners, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Mercedes
3301 Northland Dr, Ste 505
Austin, TX 78731 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Contrarian Funds, LLC
411 West Putnam Ave., Ste. 425
Greenwich, CT 06830 |
|
Creditor
Creditor
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cross-Sound Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DIP Agent and the Ad Hoc Secured Lender Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dongguan Dalingshon Xingxiong Shoes Factory/Stella International Trading Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Escada America LLC f/k/a Escada US Subco LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GLAS Trust Company LLC
230 Park Avenue 10th Floor
New York, NY 10169 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Galveston County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
H.O.P. New York Entertainment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HCL America, Inc.
Attn: Jeffrey Traurig, Esq. 630 Third Ave.
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
1 Boland Drive
West Orange, NJ 07052 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475 301 W High St.
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
NYS Department of Taxation & Finance
15 Metro Tech Center
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
National Retirement Fund
333 WESTCHESTER AVE NORTH BLD First Floor
WHITE PLAINS, NY 10604 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New York Life Insurance Company and FP Building 17, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
New York State Department Of Taxation and Finance
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Joel Oblonsky
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation c/o Shawn Christianson 55 Second Street, 17th Fl
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PT Sansan Saudaratex PT Sansan Saudaratex
Law Office of Gilbert A. Lazarus, PLLC 92-12 68th Avenue
Forest Hills, NY 11375 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Paloma Partners Management Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Port Logistics Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Presidio Networked Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Prince of Scots
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
QVC, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Republic Clothing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lillian Schneider
225 Broadway, Suite 3800
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Secured Term Loan Parties
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stella International Trading (Macao Commercial Offshore) Limited
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division PO Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taconic Capital Advisors LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund LP
555 Theodore Fremd Avenue Suite C-209
Rye, NY 10580 |
|
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taubman Landlords
Taubman Landlords 200 East Long Lake Road Suite 300
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tennenbaum Capital Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
John Stern c/o Megan Becker, Paralegal P. O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Top Silver Enterprises Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank Trust National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Sourcenet Pte Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vendor Recovery Fund IV, LLC
PO Box 669
SMITHTOWN, NY 11787 |
|
Creditor
Wah Sun Hand-Bag Factory Co. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Washington State Tax Agencies
Bankruptcy & Collections Unit 800 5th Ave., Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wide Rise Limited/Trendsetter Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Nine West Holdings, Inc., et al.
One Bryant Park
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Berkeley Research Group LLC
Berkely Research Group LLC 810 7th Avenue Suite 4100
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Protiviti Inc.
|
|
Financial Advisor
Province, Inc.
|
|
Interested Party
1411 IC-SIC Property LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Unscured Noteholders
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Unsecured Debtholders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Unsecured Noteholders
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Authentic Brands Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cherokee Debt Acquisition, LLC
1325 Avenue of the Americas, 28th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Interested Party
Concur Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
|
|
Interested Party
IT Fashion Jewelry LLC
725 Fifth Avenue 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Interested Party
KKR Asset Management
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lazard Freres & Co, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Morgan Stanley Senior Funding Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sycamore Partners, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TR Capital Management, LLC
PO Box 633
Woodmere, NY 11598 |
|
Interested Party
Unsecured Term Loan Lenders
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Brigade Capital Management, LP
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Chengdu Landun Shoemaking Industrial Co., Ltd - Sichuan New Rise Imp and Exp Co., Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Clerks Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court
|
|
Unknown
Dong Guan Qi Quan Shoes Company Limited - Mega Spring Shoes Co. Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Dongguan Hongyun Shoes, Co. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Dongguan Lirui Footwear Co., Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Duff & Phelps, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Hain Capital Group, LLC
301 Route 17 North 7th Floor
Rutherford, NJ 07070 |
|
Unknown
KKR Credit Advisors (US) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Jami B. Nimeroff
|
|
Unknown
Nishat Mills, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Oklahoma County Treasurer
|
|
Unknown
Securities and exchange commission
New York Regional Office Brookfield Place 200 Vesey Street Suite 400
New York, NY 10281 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Sichuan New Rise Imp and Exp Co., Ltd - Chengdu Yaqili Shoes Industry Co., Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Surefield Limited
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
The State of Ohio, BWC
|
|
Unknown
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
WestRock CP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
1. | Nine West files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (wivb.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/09/2018 | |