Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:18-cv-00400
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2018
Last checked: Friday May 25, 2018 4:46 AM EDT
defendant
Holland Christian Education Society
plaintiff
Michelle Hoffman
Represented By
Karen Vahlbusch Truszkowski
Temperance Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Julie Ann Jacot
Jacot Law PLLC
contact info


1. Lawsuit: Holland Christian didn't expel rapist (woodtv.com)
Submitted Thu 04/12/2018
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, August 02, 2018
11 11 order Case Management Order Thu 5:46 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 4/15/2019; dispositive motions due by 6/15/2019; settlement conference set for 9/17/2019 at 09:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 10/17/2019 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; jury trial set for 11/5/2019 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Thu 5:53 PM
MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
10 10 4 pgs misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Wed 2:53 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Jacot, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
9 9 5 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Tue 5:08 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/1/2018 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 7/25/2018; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 1:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Holland Christian Education Society (Bartosiewicz, Gary)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs notice Notice of Non-Party Fault Tue 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF NON-PARTY FAULT re BJD by defendant Holland Christian Education Society (Bartosiewicz, Gary)
Related: [-]
6 6 56 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 1:38 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Holland Christian Education Society (Bartosiewicz, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
5 5 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 1:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michelle Hoffman as to Holland Christian Education Society waiver sent on 4/13/2018, answer due 6/12/2018 (Jacot, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
4 4 1 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 11:23 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Holland Christian Education Society (ns)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Wed 11:22 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ns)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
2 2 1 pgs service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Tue 9:11 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Jacot, Julie)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 9:07 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Holland Christian Schools filed by Michelle Hoffma (Jacot, Julie) Modified text on 4/11/2018 (jlg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit B
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Tue 9:10 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Jane Doe in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4105174 (Jacot, Julie)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 9:13 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Karen Vahlbusch Truszkowski on behalf of plaintiff Jane Doe (Truszkowski, Karen)
Related: [-]
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Michelle Hoffman in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4105174 (Jacot, Julie) Modified text on 4/11/2018 (jlg)
Related: [-]