Thurs v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Magnuson |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:18-cv-00972 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 07, 2018 4:02 AM CDT |
Defendant
Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Thurs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Wed 09/26 11:01 AM
JUDGMENT(AKL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 09/25 2:27 PM
ORDER: Based on the parties' Stipulation15 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 9/25/2018. (LLM) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Mon 09/24 1:33 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re15 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Mathisen, Eric) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 09/24 1:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff, Daniel Thurs. (Mathisen, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting)
Tue 08/21 10:53 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: A status conference by telephone will be conducted in this matter by the undersigned on November 13, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., at which the Court will discuss the parties' progress in discovery and settlement negotiations and to determine whether a settlement conference with the Court should be scheduled in January or February 2019. The parties shall submit a joint status letter on or before November 9, 2018. Chambers will initiate the call. Counsel shall include in their status letter the name(s) and telephone number(s) for anyone who will participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/21/2018. (JMK) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/14 2:22 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/01/2018; Non-Dispositive Motions due by 12/01/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 03/01/2019. Signed by the Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 8/14/2018. (LLM) |
|
12 | 12
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 08/14 11:53 AM
** TEXT ONLY ENTRY ** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Magnuson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/14/2018 all by phone. Present: Brandon Operana for Plaintiff; Eric Peter Mathisen for Defendant. (ct20min) (JEP) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 08/07 2:25 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Jointly Signed by Daniel Thurs.(Mathisen, Eric) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 07/30 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Setting Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 10:20 AM TO BE HELD ALL BY PHONE, PLAINTIFF GATHER PARTIES ON THE LINE AND CALL INTO CHAMBERS AT 651-848-1150 AT THE DESIGNATED TIME, before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/11 9:12 AM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Mathisen, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/16 10:31 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric Peter Mathisen for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/16/2018. (AKL) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Tue 05/15 4:12 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric P. Mathisen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6111172 filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Shillingstad, Hal) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 05/14 4:42 PM
AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/27 11:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Daniel Thurs. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston waiver sent on 4/11/2018, answer due 6/11/2018. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/11 11:26 AM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/11 9:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (JDF) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Wed 04/11 9:45 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-972 PAM/HB. (JDF) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/10 1:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6055253) filed by Daniel Thurs. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |