California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher D Jaime
Case #: 2:18-bk-22152
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Caffe Ettore, Incorporated, a California corporation
1168 National Dr Ste 10
Sacramento, CA 95834-1979
Represented By
Walter R. Dahl
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
Robert T Matsui United States Courthouse 501 I Street, Room 7-500
Sacramento, CA 95814

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
204 204 order Assume/Reject (Order) Thu 11:02 AM
Order Approving188 Motion/Application to Reject Lease or Executory Contract [DL-7] (lars)
Related: [-]
203 203 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 1:59 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of202 Operating Report (mfrs)
Related: [-]
202 202 reports Operating Report - Including Amendments Wed 1:58 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Period Ending July 2018 (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
201 201 misc Matter Held * Wed 11:05 AM
Civil Minutes -- Motion Granted Re:188 - Motion/Application to Reject Lease or Executory Contract [DL-7] (admin)
Related: [-]
200 200 audio Audio Docket Entry Tue 3:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. These recordings are NOT the official record of any proceeding, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 8/14/2018 2:13:52 PM ]. File Size [ 341 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:50 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
199 199 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 12:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor James A. Glascock (tsef)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
198 198 misc Request for Special Notice Thu 7:28 AM
Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Craig Powell (smis)
Related: [-]