Darlene Simmons v. Life Insurance Company of North America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-03075 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 09, 2018 1:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darlene Simmons
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 08/07 10:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation15 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed in its entirety as to all defendants, with prejudice. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs in this matter. (gk) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 08/02 12:30 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Vana, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/25 4:32 PM
ORDER RE JOINT MOTION TO REOPEN CASE TO ALLOW TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT; AND REQUEST FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION FOR AN ADDITONAL THIRTY DAYS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon the Joint Motion of the parties13 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will retain jurisdiction for an additional 30 days, or until 8/22/2018. The Court continues the deadline for the parties to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated to 8/22/2018. (gk) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Leave
Fri 07/20 5:08 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Leave to REOPEN CASE AND TO REQUEST COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION filed by Plaintiff Darlene Simmons.(Bather, Phillip) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order TO REOPEN CASE AND REQUEST FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION | ||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 06/08 11:37 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.11 THE COURT having been advised by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 45 days, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rfi) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Settlement
Wed 06/06 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Darlene Simmons. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 05/01 11:08 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 6/6/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Allison Anne Vana added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Vana, Allison) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 04/18 4:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Darlene Simmons, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez-Fulfillment Specialist for CT Corporation System Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 04/16 10:05 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/13 12:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 04/13 12:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 04/13 12:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 04/12 1:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Darlene Simmons. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 04/12 1:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Darlene Simmons. (Bather, Phillip) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/12 1:03 PM
Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Darlene Simmons, (Bather, Phillip) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/12 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21578046 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Darlene Simmons. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Darlene Simmons(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip) |