Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company v. Sharpe
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-00365 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 10, 2018 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
Tajae Sharpe
|
|
Plaintiff
Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Entry of Judgment
Fri 06/14 11:33 AM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:32 Order. (dt) |
|
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/14 11:32 AM
ORDER: This case is DISMISSED, with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. This order shall constitute the final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/14/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Proposed Order of Dismissal
Thu 06/13 2:32 PM
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AGREED filed by Tajae Sharpe. (Bellamy, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 05/14 2:25 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Order of Compromise and Dismissal (Doc. No.29 ) indicating that the parties require additional time to finalize the settlement. The Court GRANTS an extension to June 13, 2019, for parties to finalize a settlement agreement or otherwise notify the Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/14/19. (dt) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 05/13 6:01 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Order of Compromise and Dismissal by Tajae Sharpe. (Bellamy, Christopher) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/12 12:05 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Order of Compromise and Dismissal (Doc. No.27 ) indicating that the parties require additional time to finalize the settlement. The Court GRANTS an extension to May 13, 2019, for parties to finalize a settlement agreement or otherwise notify the Court. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/12/19. (dt) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 04/11 4:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Dedman, Marc) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/15 2:55 PM
ORDER: The Court having been advised that this action has been settled, the action is dismissed without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within thirty (30) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Within this thirty day period, the parties may submit a proposed agreed order of compromise and dismissal. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/15/19. (dt) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
adr
Report of Mediation
Thu 03/14 4:18 PM
REPORT of Mediation filed by Gail Vaughn Ashworth, Mediator. (**Case settled).(af) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Mon 03/11 10:04 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tajae Sharpe. Amendment to23 Notice (Other) Amended Certificate of Service . (Peal, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
misc
Annotation - Deficiency Notice
Fri 03/08 2:32 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#23 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/06 9:10 AM
NOTICE by Tajae Sharpe Withdrawal of Counsel (Peal, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 03/05 1:02 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to April 9, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Should the parties reach a resolution of this matter before that date, they shall so inform the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/5/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Continue
Tue 03/05 10:47 AM
MOTION to Continue by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Dedman, Marc) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 03/05 1:03 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) |
||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Thu 02/14 2:53 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Reset the Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for March 6, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/14/19. (dt) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 02/14 2:54 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/6/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) |
||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Hearing
Wed 02/13 2:57 PM
MOTION for Hearing re Set/Reset Hearings Joint Motion to Reset the Initial Case Management Conference by Tajae Sharpe. (Peal, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 01/17 8:36 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference. The initial case management conference is RESET for February 20, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/16/18. (dt) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 01/16 1:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Request Second Resetting of Initial Case Management Conference re15 Order,, Set Hearings,14 Notice (Other) by Tajae Sharpe. (Peal, Robert) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 01/17 8:38 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/20/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) Modified on 1/17/2019 (dt) |
||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/04 3:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Tajae Sharpe.(Bellamy, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant Sharpe's Answer to Mr. Satterfield's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs' Counterclaim | ||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Wed 11/28 11:45 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert A. Peal and Christopher Michael Bellamy. (dt) |
||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 11/27 2:15 PM
ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/23/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 774 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. The parties shall file a joint proposed case management order by no later than January 18, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/27/18. (dt) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/26 4:01 PM
NOTICE by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company Request for Resetting of Initial Case Management Conference (Dedman, Marc) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/26 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Bellamy on behalf of Tajae Sharpe (Bellamy, Christopher) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/26 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Peal on behalf of Tajae Sharpe (Peal, Robert) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 10/04 3:58 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. Tajae Sharpe served on 10/4/2018. (Dedman, Marc) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/04 10:33 AM
Summons issued as to Tajae Sharpe. (dt) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status Report
Fri 09/28 3:29 PM
STATUS REPORT as to Service of Process by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Dedman, Marc) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Mon 06/11 9:19 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Plaintiff is ORDERED to notify the Court when service has been achieved and move to reset the initial case management conference. If service is not achieved within 60 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file a status report with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/11/18. (dt) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Continue
Fri 06/08 1:58 PM
MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. (Dedman, Marc) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/18 3:32 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conferenceby order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/18/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (dt) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Mon 04/16 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (dt) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/16 12:15 PM
Summons issued as to Tajae Sharpe. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.)(dt) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Fri 04/13 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Fri 04/13 11:40 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/13 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Tajae Sharpe (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2651643), filed by Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.(gb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Insurance Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - State Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 04/13 11:41 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Marc O. Dedman. (gb) |