SMITH v. ABBOTT LABORATORIES et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Claire C Cecchi |
Referred: | Mark Falk |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-07609 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 13, 2018 4:55 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
WYETH LLC
|
|
Defendant
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.
|
|
Defendant
TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
PFIZER, INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC.
|
|
Defendant
NOVARTIS CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC.
|
|
Defendant
MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE LP
|
|
Defendant
GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC
|
|
Defendant
GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) IP LLC
|
|
Defendant
EISAI, CO., LTD
|
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP
|
|
Defendant
ASTRAZENECA LP
|
|
Defendant
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
|
|
Defendant
WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES
|
|
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II)
|
|
Plaintiff
RETA SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
30+
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Thu 08/02 11:25 AM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/1/18. (gh, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/18 12:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, EISAI, CO., LTD, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) IP LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC., NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC., PFIZER, INC., PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., and WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Kimberly Darling* (kd) |
|
order
Case Management Order
Wed 04/18 12:22 PM
For all Case Management Orders[LINK:click here] (kd) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Wed 04/18 12:23 PM
Member Case Direct File on 4/16/2018, for MDL 2789 Party PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II). (kd) |
||
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Mon 04/16 6:43 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint,,,, by DAVID SMITH. (GANTENBEIN, MARY) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/16 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT against ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, EISAI, CO., LTD, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) IP LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS (US) LLC, GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALTHCARE LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH, INC., NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVARTIS INSTITUTES FOR BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION, NOVARTIS VACCINES AND DIAGNOSTICS, INC., PFIZER, INC., PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. F/K/A TAKEDA GLOBAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. F/K/A TAP HOLDINGS INC., THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, WYETH LLC, WYETH PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., WYETH-AYERST LABORATORIES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8654798) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DAVID SMITH.(GANTENBEIN, MARY) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 04/16 2:45 PM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (jml, ) |