Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Hollycal Production, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-00768 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 13, 2018 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hollycal Production, Inc.
5581 Cambria Drive
Mira Loma, CA 91752 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Darshan Kamboj
|
|
Defendant
Pushpindra Sukhwal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Satyam Sukhwal
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Peter K Rosen
|
|
Plaintiff
Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
Thu 03/07 12:56 PM
BILL OF COSTS. Costs taxed in the amount of $1,808.21 in favor of Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and against Defendants Hollycal Production, Inc., Pushpindra Sukhwal, and Satyam Sukhwal. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs on All Defendants re: Judgment.41 ,42 (vmun) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Fri 01/18 1:54 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Mediation held on January 15, 2019 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (mb) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
Fri 12/14 12:30 PM
APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs All Defendants re: Judgment,41 , filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 12/12 10:44 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge Percy Anderson. In accordance with the Court's December 7, 2018 minute order granting summary judgment to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company ("Plaintiff"), it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: (see document for details). (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Lodging
Tue 12/11 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,39(Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment | ||
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
order
Summary Judgment
Mon 12/10 2:29 PM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that Plaintiff has no continuing duty to defend Insured Defendants in the state court action and has no duty to indemnify Insured Defendants. As such, Plaintiff is also entitled to reimbursement for defense-related payments and any indemnity paid. Plaintiff thus is entitled to summary judgment on the first, second, third, and fourth claims for relief in the FAC. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No.36 ) is GRANTED. (jp) |
|
38 | 38
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 12/07 10:42 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, MOTION for Summary Judgment36 currently set for hearing on December 10, 2018 is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Non-Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/26 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 36 filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 11/08 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Of Jo Ann Montoya ISO MSJ, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Of Wendy Bush ISO MSJ, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Compendium of Evidence ISO MSJ, | ||
Att: 4 Separate Statement ISO MSJ, | ||
Att: 5 Request for Judicial Notice ISO MSJ, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 11/06 3:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court is in receipt of the response34 filed by plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Plaintiff) to the Court's October 12, 2018 Order to Show Cause32 as well as defendant Darshan Kambojs Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint33 . The Order to Show Cause is discharged. (lom) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Response
Mon 10/22 1:29 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Companyto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines32 (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 10/18 10:52 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,10 filed by defendant Darshan Kamboj.(Attorney Anju Multani added to party Darshan Kamboj(pty:dft))(Multani, Anju) |
|
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 10/12 12:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 10/22/2018.) (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 09/12 8:35 AM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, upon Defendant Darshan Kamboj served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Mon 07/30 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Peter K. Rosen has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (Killefer, Gail) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Wed 07/25 9:13 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Peter Rosen may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 1/15/2019 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
26
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/06 1:03 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER[FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Pe rcy Anderson. The following dates are set: 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of January 14, 2019; 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of January 28, 2019; 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for March 1, 2019, at 1:30 p.m.; 4. Setting Court Trial Date of March 26, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. See document for details. (lom) |
|
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 07/06 7:26 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Courts own motion, Scheduling Conference currently set for hearing on July 9, 2018 is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Fri 07/06 2:26 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than February 4, 2019. Within twenty-one (21) days, plaintiff shall obtain the consent of a neutral listed on the Court's Mediation Panel who will conduct the mediation, and file form ADR-2, Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator. If the parties have not selected and obtained the consent of a Panel Mediator within twenty-one (21) days, the ADR Program will assign one. (lom) |
|
27 | 27
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Fri 07/06 2:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates"attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Absent extraordinary circumstances, which must satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and be brought to the Court's attention in a timely manner, the Court will not modify these dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for July 9, 2018, at 10:30 a.m., is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Statement
Wed 06/27 4:27 PM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Mon 06/04 11:47 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer toFirst Complaint20 by Clerk. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel are ordered to file a Notice of Interested Parties forthwith. See Local Rule 7.1-1. (lom) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 06/01 1:53 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint,20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/29 3:04 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/29 11:24 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,10 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Hollycal Production, Inc., Pushpindra Sukhwal, Satyam Sukhwal.(Attorney Amy M Ghosh added to party Hollycal Production, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy M Ghosh added to party Pushpindra Sukhwal(pty:dft), Attorney Amy M Ghosh added to party Satyam Sukhwal(pty:dft))(Ghosh, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 05/09 9:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson re: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)14 . Because the Answer (Docket No. 14) is improper under the Local Rules, it is hereby stricken. Hollycal Production, Inc. shall file an answer, through counsel, on or before May 29, 2018. In addition, Pushpindra Sukhwal and Satyam Sukhwal shall file answers each on their own behalf, on or before May 29, 2018. (See document for details) (mrgo) |
|
18 | 18
15
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/08 4:39 PM
SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (lom) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 05/07 4:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Hollycal Production, Inc., re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)14 , Notice of Appearance16 , Declaration15 served on 5/4/18. (mrgo) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Appearance
Mon 05/07 4:37 PM
PRO SE NOTICE of Appearance filed. (mrgo) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Declaration
Mon 05/07 4:36 PM
DECLARATION of Hollycal Production Inc Regarding Income and Assests Exempt from Garnishment filed by Defendant Hollycal Production, Inc. (mrgo) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/07 4:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint/Petition,10 filed by defendant Hollycal Production, Inc.(mrgo) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/30 3:51 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, upon Defendant Satyam Sukhwal served on 4/23/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pushpindra Sukhwal, Co-Occupant in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/30 3:04 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, upon Defendant Pushpindra Sukhwal served on 4/23/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant Pushpindra Sukhwal, also known as Paul Sukhwal in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/30 2:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, upon Defendant Hollycal Production, Inc. served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pooja Patel, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 04/18 11:16 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Hollycal Production, Inc., Darshan Kamboj, Pushpindra Sukhwal, Satyam Sukhwal amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to First Amended Complaint | ||
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 04/18 9:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the Court dismisses the Complaint. Despite these deficiencies a district court may, and should, grant leave to amend when it appears that subject matter jurisdiction may exist, even though the complaint inadequately alleges jurisdiction. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend the Complaint to attempt to establish federal subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, if any, shall be filed on or before May 2, 2018. The failure to file a First Amended Complaint by that date, or to adequately allege the Court's jurisdiction, may result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) |
|
8 | 8
10
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/17 3:03 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/16 5:41 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Hollycal Production, Inc., Darshan Kamboj, Pushpindra Sukhwal, Satyam Sukhwal. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 04/16 5:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 04/16 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 04/16 2:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 04/16 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, identifying Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Tokio Marine North America, Inc., Tokio Marine and Nichido Fire Insurance Company, Ltd., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc.. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 04/16 2:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/16 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21593543 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attorney Lisa Marie Darling Alderton added to party Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Darling Alderton, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit to Complaint |