MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Kearney |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-01643 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 15, 2018 5:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
GEOFF DOYER
|
|
Plaintiff
MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
GEOFF DOYER
228 E MULBERRY STREET
KENNETT SQUARE, PA 19348 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Terminated: 07/16/2018
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Tue 10/23 11:28 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of MALIBU MEDIA, LLC in the amount of $6,750.00 for statutory damages and $932.53 in costs and against GEOFF DOYER. GREGG DOYER SHALL DESTROY ALL COPIES OF THE NINE COPYRIGHTED WORKS ON COMPUTER DEVICES IN HIS POSSESSION, CUSTODY OR CONTROL NO LATER THAN 10/31/18. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/22/18. 10/23/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
20 | 20
5
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 10/23 10:55 AM
ORDER-MEMORANDUM THAT PLAINTIFFS UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DAMAGES (DOC. 17) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/22/18. 10/23/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 10/22 2:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2018 re17 First MOTION for Default Judgment against Geoff Doyer filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC Court Reporter: ESR. (kp, ) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 10/01 2:39 PM
RESPONSE in Support re17 First MOTION for Default Judgment against Geoff Doyer filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit | ||
17 | 17
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 10/01 2:23 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment against Geoff Doyer filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC..(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/20 2:14 PM
NOTICE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/13 12:46 PM
ORDER THAT THE COURT SHALL HOLD A HEARING TO DETERMINE DAMAGES AND ADDRESS DEFENSES ON 10/22/2018 AT 12:00 PM in COURTROOM 6B before HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY. PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE THIS ORDER AND THE AMENDED COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT NO LATER THAN 9/17/2018, WITH PROOF OF SERVICE FILED NO LATER THAN 9/20/2018. PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DAMAGES BY 10/1/2018.,.). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 9/13/2018. 9/13/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(kp, ) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 09/11 2:50 PM
Request for Entry of Default Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(a) against Geoff Doyer filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. Certificate of Service.(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 9/11/2018 (tjd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 09/12 4:33 PM
DEFAULT BY GEOFF DOYER FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (kp, ) |
||
misc
Default Entered
Wed 09/12 4:33 PM
Default Entered (kp, ) |
||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Fri 08/24 9:09 AM
Letter from ULRIKE HEVENER, COURTROOM DEPUTY TO JUDGE KEARNEY TO CHRISTOPHER FIORE ON 8/23/2018 RE:RULE 55 and REQUEST FOR DEFAULT. (kp, ) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 08/03 2:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Court House Legal Services re: served Summons and Complaint upon Geoff DOyer by Personal on 07/30/2018 (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/01 3:38 PM
NOTICE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 07/18 9:37 AM
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S LAST-MINUTE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE THE DEFENDANT SWORN TO BE RESIDING IN THIS DISTRICT WITH THE SUMMONS AND SHOWING LIMITED GOOD CAUSE BASED UPON PLAINTIFF'S SWEARING IT ONLY RECEIVED THE SUMMONS YESTERDAY BASED ON IT UNTIMELY FILING OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED IN PART AND PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL AUGUST 3, 2018 TO EFFECT SERVICE UPON THE DEFENDANT RESIDENT OF THIS DISTRICT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 7/17/18.7/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 07/17 2:55 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Serve Defendant with Summons and Complaint filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC..(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/16 11:59 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT together with Jury Demand against GEOFF DOYER, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(ti, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/16 12:01 PM
Summons Issued as to GEOFF DOYER. One Original Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/16/18 (ti, ) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend
Mon 06/11 10:37 AM
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOITON IS GRANTED IN PART AND WE AMEND OUR APRIL 24, 2018 TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO AMEND ITS COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN JULY 9, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 6/8/18.6/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to Amend
Fri 06/08 12:12 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC..(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/24 3:23 PM
NOTICE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/24 12:16 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION (DOC. 3) IS GRANTED. AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 6/8/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/24/18. 4/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, ) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 04/23 4:01 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.Memorandum.(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Memorandum | ||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Thu 04/19 11:27 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(mbh, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/19 11:19 AM
Complaint against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE176978) filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(mbh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Coversheet, | ||
Att: 4 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 5 Case Management Track | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 04/19 11:21 AM
Demand for Trial by Jury. (mbh, ) |