Emergency Medical Services Authority v. PMP Successor, LLC ***DO NOT FILE IN THIS CONSOLIDATED CASE. All Filings to be Made in Lead Case
Oklahoma Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Terence Kern |
Referred: | Jodi F Jayne |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00216 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Apr 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 16, 2018 4:27 AM CDT |
Defendant
PMP Successor, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emergency Medical Services Authority
|
Represented By
|
1. | EMSA sues former ambulance contractor over attorney fees in kickbacks lawsuit (tulsaworld.com) |
Submitted Fri 04/20/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
utility
Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case
Wed 06/12 11:16 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number [90 in 18-cv-278-TCK-JFJ]) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) |
||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
01 - Order Case - Consolidated Ruling on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Tue 07/03 4:19 PM
ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; consolidating cases (trial); granting18 Motion to Consolidate Cases (lmc, Chambers) |
|
utility
Remark
Thu 07/05 2:31 PM
***Remark: All future pleadings to be filed in Lead Case Number 18-CV-278-TCK-JFJ (see document number22 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) |
||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1
Mon 06/25 12:58 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by PMP Successor, LLC (Ray, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Case - Number Changed
Wed 06/20 10:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , reassigning case to Judge Terence Kern, as related case to 18-CV-278-TCK-JFJ. Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 18-CV-216-TCK-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Answer
Mon 06/18 10:51 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by PMP Successor, LLC (Ray, Ryan) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Consolidate Cases
Fri 06/15 11:44 AM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by PMP Successor, LLC (Ray, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)
Tue 06/05 4:01 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 6/25/2018); granting16 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)
Tue 06/05 2:49 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by PMP Successor, LLC (Ray, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
01 - Order Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)
Thu 05/17 4:21 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell extending deadline to 6/18/2018 ; granting14 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)
Thu 05/17 3:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to Respond to Complaint by PMP Successor, LLC (With attachments) (Ray, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
02 - Minute Order Directing - Party Name be Corrected
Wed 05/16 3:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Paramedics Plus, LLC be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Party Name Correction
Wed 05/16 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Paramedics Plus, LLC (With attachments) (Ray, Ryan) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Disclosure Statement (Corporate)
Wed 05/16 2:39 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent ETX Successor Regional Health Services, Inc., Corporate Parent ETX Successor System for Paramedics Plus, LLC) by Paramedics Plus, LLC (Ray, Ryan) |
|
10 | 10
order
02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/16 9:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Paramedics Plus, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report
Tue 05/15 2:16 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/5/2018) (kjp, Dpty Clk) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Mon 05/14 1:33 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Paramedics Plus, LLC [Note: Attorney Ryan A Ray added to party Paramedics Plus, LLC(pty:dft).] (Ray, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/01 1:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Paramedics Plus, LLC by Emergency Medical Services Authority (Folluo, Dan) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/01 1:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Paramedics Plus, LLC by Emergency Medical Services Authority (Folluo, Dan) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement (Corporate)
Fri 04/20 11:10 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emergency Medical Services Authority (Marciano, Lauren) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/20 10:53 AM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Paramedics Plus, LLC (jln, Dpty Clk) |
|
3 | 3
order
02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/20 10:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Emergency Medical Services Authority to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/19 12:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Emergency Medical Services Authority (Folluo, Dan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/19 12:53 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Emergency Medical Services Authority (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1904993) by Emergency Medical Services Authority (Folluo, Dan) |