SunEdison Litigation Trust v. Cool Blew, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10992
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stuart M Bernstein |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01487 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 13, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cool Blew, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SunEdison Litigation Trust
Cole Schotz P.C. David R. Hurst 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/13 10:02 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1487 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda) |
||
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice
Thu 03/04 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment . Notice Date 03/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Case Reassignment Notice (BNC)
Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment from Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge David S. Jones. (adi) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 07/27 1:19 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Motion, Extend Time
Wed 06/13 7:24 PM
Motion to Extend Time (SunEdison Litigation Trusts Motion for Order Extending Time for Service of Process Pursuant to Rules 7004(a) and 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Certain Adversary Proceedings) filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust with hearing to be held on 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 7/3/2018,. (Hurst, David) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Motion | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Motion - Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/06 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service of P. Ratkowiak regarding service of Complaint, Second Summons and Order Granting SunEdison Litigation Trust's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 5390] Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 05/30 2:35 PM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Cool Blew, Inc. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Wed 05/30 10:46 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
||
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 04/20 10:54 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB), Answer due by 5/21/2018, (Braithwaite, Kenishia) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 04/20 9:55 AM
Adversary case 18-01487 Complaint against Cool Blew, Inc. to: (I) Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550; and (II) Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502(d) (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David R. Hurst on behalf of SunEdison Litigation Trust. (Hurst, David) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Fri 04/20 2:31 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-01487 smb) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12540135. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |