Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:18-cv-03540 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 17, 2018 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Thu 08/23 7:55 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 8/22/2018 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/22 8:12 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) John Doe. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (James, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 07/19 1:09 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's application for an extension of time until September 25, 2018 is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 11). SO ORDERED. Service due by 9/25/2018. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/19/2018) (rj) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 07/18 4:38 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time within Which to Effectuate Service on Defendant addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jacqueline M. James. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 06/05 8:02 AM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting8 Motion for Discovery. SO ORDERED. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 8). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/4/2018) (rj) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 06/01 12:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
8 | 8
motion
Discovery
Fri 06/01 12:25 PM
MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Fri 06/01 11:31 AM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application to file a motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena is Granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 6). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/1/2018) (mro) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/01 8:40 AM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Request to Adjourn the Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Jacqueline M. James. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Mon 04/23 10:23 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (vf) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 04/23 10:18 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 04/23 10:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 04/23 10:19 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient AO 120/121 Form
Mon 04/23 10:22 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James re: Document No. 4 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Docket Number field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney. Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies. (vf) |
||
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Fri 04/20 5:23 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/20 4:42 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/20 4:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/20 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14971175)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |