HATFIELD v. JANSSEN ORTHO LLC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-08135 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 17, 2018 4:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
JANSSEN ORTHO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
In Re
INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH L. HATFIELD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Fri 10/11 4:07 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/11/2019. (jmh) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
Fri 10/11 1:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOSEPH L. HATFIELD. (TAYLOR, THOMAS) |
|
mdl
MDL Closed
Fri 10/11 4:07 PM
Member Case Closed on 10/11/2019 for MDL 2750. (jmh) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/11 9:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(ZOGBY, MICHAEL) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/23 2:30 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *SHANNON BARLOW* (sab) |
|
mdl
MDL Direct File
Mon 04/23 2:31 PM
Member Case Direct File on 4/23/2018, for MDL 16-2750 Party INVOKANA (CANAGLIFLOZIN) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (sab) |
||
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/20 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against JANSSEN ORTHO LLC, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8679584) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOSEPH L. HATFIELD.(TAYLOR, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 04/20 4:14 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (sab) |